Caraballo v. Automated Collection Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Josefina Caraballo
Defendant: Automated Collection Services, Inc. and Conn's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00430
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. No. #7 ), The Notice was filed prior to Defendant an answer or motion for summary judgment. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), therefore, the Notice sufficed to dismiss this action without any action on the part of the Court. The Notice states that dismissal is without prejudice, and therefore under Rule 41(a)(1) (B), the dismissal is without prejudice. Accordingly, the Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE effective as of the time of the filing of the Notice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/10/2020. (vh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Josefina Caraballo (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Thompson, Christopher)
May 22, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Aaron D. Radbil: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/12/2020. (vh)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Automated Collection Services, Inc. and Conn's, Inc. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
May 20, 2020 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) Christopher K. Thompson and (TX) Aaron D. Radbil. (vh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Automated Collection Services, Inc., Conn's, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3144919), filed by Josefina Caraballo. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caraballo v. Automated Collection Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automated Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Caraballo
Represented By: Christopher K. Thompson
Represented By: Aaron D. Radbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?