Burgett v. Dowell et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Wesley Burgett
Defendant: Domingo R. Dowell, Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. and Arrow Critical Supply Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00444
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
May 26, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph R. Wheeler, Jason K. Murrie, Thomas I. Carlton, Jr, Justin L. Crouch, James T. Sullivan and Natalie R. Sharp. (dt)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Arrow Critical Supply Solutions, Inc., Critical Supply Solutions, Inc., Domingo R. Dowell.(dt) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/26/2020) (dt).
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. (dt) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/26/2020) (dt).
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arrow Critical Supply Solutions, Inc., Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. and Domingo R. Dowell from Circuit Court for Sumner County, Tennessee, case number 83CC1-2020-CV-118. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3147015) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sumner Circuit Notice of Removal and Attachment 1 Federal Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/26/2020) (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgett v. Dowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo R. Dowell
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler
Represented By: Jason K. Murrie
Represented By: Thomas I. Carlton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critical Supply Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler
Represented By: Jason K. Murrie
Represented By: Thomas I. Carlton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Critical Supply Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler
Represented By: Jason K. Murrie
Represented By: Thomas I. Carlton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wesley Burgett
Represented By: James T. Sullivan
Represented By: Justin L. Crouch
Represented By: Natalie R. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?