Cotham Jr v. Boyd
Petitioner: Coy Cotham Jr
Respondent: Warden Bert C. Boyd
Case Number: 3:2020cv00470
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Motion to Amend the Petition. (Doc. No. #11 .) The motion seeks to add approximately one page of legal argument. (See id.) Because Respondent has not yet filed an answer, this motion is GRANTED. No additional filings are necessary; the additional argument provided in the motion shall be considered part of the Petition. Respondent has filed a Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Doc. No. #12 .) Respondent requests an additional 28 days to file the answer. (Id.) For good cause stated, this motion is GRANTED. Respondent shall answer the Petition by August 20, 2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bert C. Boyd. (Bolduc, Nicholas)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It appears from Petitioner's in forma pauperis application (Doc. No. #3 at 1-6) and certified inmate trust account statement (id. at 7-18) that he does not have sufficient financial resources to pay the filing fee. Petitioner's application is therefore GRANTED. Respondent is DIRECTED to file an answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Petition in accordance with Habeas Rule 5 within 30 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket. Petitioner may file a reply to Respondent's answer, limited to disputing specific points of fact or law raised in the answer, within 30 DAYS of the date the answer is filed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order on Respondent and the Attorney General of Tennessee. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. No. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party, Respondent (w/DE 1) and A.G (w/DE 1) by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) Modified on 6/25/2020 (vh).
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Coy Cotham Jr. (vh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Coy Cotham Jr. (vh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Daubert Hearing by Coy Cotham Jr. (vh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #34675059034 in the amount of $5 posted by Coy Cotham Jr re filing fee for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (vh)
June 9, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas S. Bolduc. (vh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Bolduc on behalf of Bert C. Boyd (Bolduc, Nicholas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Coy Cotham Jr. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Coy Cotham Jr. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Coy Cotham Jr. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Coy Cotham Jr.(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotham Jr v. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coy Cotham Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Bert C. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?