Garner et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Harold M. Garner, Jr and Nakevia D. Garner
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2020cv00491
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 10:30 a.m., Friday, September 11, 2020. Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID- 19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on July 8, 2020, the initial casemanagement conference in this case will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753; Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) Modified on 7/10/2020 (vh).
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Kern, Elle)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh)
June 12, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Thomas Bateman, George Andrew Rowlett, and Elle G. Kern. (vh)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (vh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, TN, case number CC-20-CV-882. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3157049) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold M. Garner, Jr
Represented By: Robert Thomas Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakevia D. Garner
Represented By: Robert Thomas Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Elle G. Kern
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?