MicroPort Orthopedics Inc v. Medacta USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: MicroPort Orthopedics Inc
Defendant: Medacta USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00495
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Alexander Fardon on behalf of Medacta USA, Inc. (Fardon, D.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Keane A. Barger on behalf of Medacta USA, Inc. (Barger, Keane)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motions to appear pro hac vice (Doc. Nos. #15 , #16 , and #17 ) of Charles L. Solomont, Jason C. White, and Nicholas A. Restauri are GRANTED. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court Vicki R. Kinkade on 7/26/2020. (dt)
July 27, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael C. Polovich . MA State Bar status verified as active for Charles L. Solomont. IL State Bar status verified as active for Jason C. White and Nicholas A. Restauri. (dt) Modified on 7/27/2020 (dt).
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Charles L. Solomont from the United States District Court filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service of the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles L. Solomont filed by Medacta USA, Inc. re #15 MOTION for attorney Charles L. Solomont to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176978) filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas A. Restauri filed by Medacta USA, Inc. re #17 MOTION for attorney Nicholas A. Restauri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176982) filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 24 (DISREGARD-ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR-ATTORNEY TO REFILE) CERTIFICATE of Service - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Medacta USA, Inc. re #17 MOTION for attorney Nicholas A. Restauri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176982) filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael) Modified on 7/17/2020 (dt).
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Medacta USA, Inc. re #16 MOTION for attorney Jason C. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176981) filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Nicholas A. Restauri from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jason C. White from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Polovich on behalf of Medacta USA, Inc. (Polovich, Michael)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#15 , #16 and #17 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificates shall be filed within 10 days. (dt)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 , #15 , #16 , #17 and #18 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (dt)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Nicholas A. Restauri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176982) by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Jason C. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176981) by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Charles L. Solomont to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3176978) by Medacta USA, Inc.. (Polovich, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Polovich on behalf of Medacta USA, Inc. (Polovich, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motions to appear pro hac vice (Doc. Nos. #7 , #8 , #9 and #10 ) of Karina N. Pundeff, Desmond O'Sullivan, Eric M. Acker, and John R. Lanham are GRANTED. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court Vicki R. Kinkade on 7/13/2020. (dt)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MicroPort Orthopedics Inc. Medacta USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/17/2020. (Van Horn, Daniel)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 3:30 p.m., Wednesday, September 23, 2020. Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on July 8, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney John R. Lanham to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3172249) by MicroPort Orthopedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Horn, Daniel)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Eric M. Acker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3172248) by MicroPort Orthopedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Horn, Daniel)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Desmond O'Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3172245) by MicroPort Orthopedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Horn, Daniel)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Karina N. Pundeff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3172244) by MicroPort Orthopedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Horn, Daniel)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Medacta USA, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
June 17, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Eric M. Acker, Desmond O'Sullivan, John R. Lanham, Karina N. Pundeff: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/8/2020. (dt)
June 17, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Warren Van Horn and Diana M. Comes. CA State Bar status verified as active for Eric M. Acker, Desmond O'Sullivan, John R. Lanham and Karina N. Pundeff. (dt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medacta USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3157924), filed by MicroPort Orthopedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '028 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '229 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - '501 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - '113 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5 - '721 Patent, #6 Exhibit 6 - '317 Patent, #7 Exhibit 7 - APA, #8 Exhibit 8 - Extension Request, #9 Exhibit 9 - 1st Amendment to APA, #10 Exhibit 10 - Distributor Agmt, #11 Exhibit 11 - May 14 Notice, #12 Exhibit 12 - Resignation and Termination Letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - Interim Award, #14 Exhibit 14 - Final Award, #15 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MicroPort Orthopedics Inc v. Medacta USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medacta USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. White
Represented By: D. Alexander Fardon
Represented By: Nicholas A. Restauri
Represented By: Michael C. Polovich
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Keane A. Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MicroPort Orthopedics Inc
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Represented By: Eric M. Acker
Represented By: Desmond O'Sullivan
Represented By: Karina N. Pundeff
Represented By: John R. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?