United States of America v. Hellmann, Jr et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles B. Hellmann, Jr and Janice S. Hellmann
Case Number: 3:2020cv00537
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Upon consideration of the United States' Motion to Stay Case #11 , and good cause appearing, it is hereby: ORDERED that the United States' Motion is granted; ORDERED that this matter is stayed pending the resolution of Helmann v. United States, No 3:19-ap-90024 (Bankr. M.D. TN.); ORDERED that all case-related deadlines, including the deadline for the United States to serve defendants with process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), are suspended while this case is stayed. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/30/2020. (mg)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay case pending resolution of Hellmann v. United States, 3:19-ap-90024 (Bankr. M.D. TN) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(McMonagle, Ryan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Kyle Bishop's motion #9 to withdraw as counsel for the United States is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/13/2020. (mg)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed as notice pursuant to Local Rule 83.01(g) by United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #6 ) of Ryan O'Connor McMonagle is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki r. Kinkade, Acting Clerk on 7/11/2020. (mg) Modified on 7/13/2020 (mg).
July 8, 2020 CA State Bar status verified as active for Ryan O'Connor McMonagle. (mg)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Ryan O'Connor McMonagle from the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee filed by United States of America re #6 Motion. (mg)
July 6, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: The PHV motion must be accompanied by a Certificate of Good Standing from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court, the certificate submitted was encrypted. Counsel to refile the Certificate of Good Standing. (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Ryan O'Connor McMonagle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by United States of America. (mg) Modified on 7/6/2020 (mg).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/26/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Janice S. Hellmann, and Charles B. Hellmann, Jr. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kyle L. Bishop: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted. (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/16/2020. (mg)
June 25, 2020 D.C. Bar status verified as active for Kyle L. Bishop. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janice S. Hellmann, Charles B. Hellmann, Jr, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hellmann, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Hellmann, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice S. Hellmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Represented By: Ryan O'Connor McMonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?