Knopp v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Steven Knopp
Defendant: United States of America, Amanda Williams and Lloyd M. Williams, III
Case Number: 3:2020cv00567
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Steven Knopp (Linkowski, Brian)
August 18, 2020 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 9/29/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: MOTION #8 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to September 29, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/18/2020. (mg) Modified on 8/18/2020 (mg).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by United States of America. (Jordan, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Jordan on behalf of United States of America (Jordan, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Atyia on behalf of United States of America (Atyia, Dean)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to United States of America, Amanda Williams, Lloyd M. Williams, III. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 1, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian Linkowski. (Mr. Linkowski is admitted to practice in this district.) (mg) Modified on 7/1/2020 (mg).
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, Amanda Williams, Lloyd M. Williams, III (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3168611), filed by Steven Knopp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2016 Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Tax Lien, #3 Exhibit C - 2018 Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Owner's Affidavit and Indemnity, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knopp v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Knopp
Represented By: Brian Linkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen P. Jordan
Represented By: Dean Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd M. Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?