Westgate Resorts, Ltd. et al v. Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC and Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC
Defendant: Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00599
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 53 b
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 59 Case transferred in from the District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-01982. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 14, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David B. King, Vincent Falcone, III, Robyn Michelle Kramer, Olga M. Vieira, Richard W. Epstein, Jeffrey Aaron Backman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 8/4/2020. (mg)
July 14, 2020 FL State Bar status verified as active for David B. King, Vincent Falcone, III, Robyn Michelle Kramer, Olga M. Vieira, Richard W. Epstein, Jeffrey Aaron Backman. (mg)
July 14, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David B. King, Vincent Falcone, III, Robyn Michelle Kramer, Olga M. Vieira, Richard W. Epstein, Jeffrey Aaron Backman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/4/2020. (mg)
June 9, 2020 Filing 58 TRANSFER to the District of Middle District of Tennessee. (MAA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/8/2020. (JBS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Middle District of Tennessee. The Clerk is thereafter DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/8/2020. (JBS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Transfer Action by Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Vieira, Olga) Modified on 6/8/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties shall abide by the deadlines set forth in Plaintiff's Motion. The parties are warned that no further extensions will be granted with respect to Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/27/2020. (JBS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Jurisdictional) and Related Deadlines by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #43 DEFENDANT'S TIME-SENSITIVE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO BETTER BUSINESS BUREAU, INC. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/22/2020. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Protective Order as to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Better Business Bureau, Inc. (Time-Sensitive) filed by Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vieira, Olga) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STANDING ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION; denying as moot #48 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED (CONDITIONAL) MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH STANDING ORDER ON CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY DESIGNATIONS OF CUSTOMER INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/20/2020. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Protective Order as to Attorneys' Eyes Only Designations of Customer Information by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3)(King, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Comply with Standing Order on Confidential Information in Connection with Defendant's Motion for Protective Order as to Attorneys' Eyes Only Designations of Customer Information by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically from Standing Order Regarding Confidential Information by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #44 PLAINTIFFS' [REDACTED] MOTION CHALLENGING DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATION OF PLAINTIFFS' CUSTOMER INFORMATION; denying as moot #45 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE D.E. 44 UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/13/2020. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/12/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 44 REDACTED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Challenging Defendant's Attorneys' Eyes Only Confidentiality Designation of Plaintiffs' Customer Information by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Vieira, Olga) Modified on 5/12/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Protective Order as to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Better Business Bureau, Inc. (Time-Sensitive) by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Falcone, Vincent) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Set/reset deadlines as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 6/3/2020 (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Jurisdictional Discovery and Response to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/28/2020. (Smith, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Deadline for Supplemental Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Vieira, Olga) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Amie First. (ARF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on March 4, 2020, before Judge Thomas B. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amie R. First, RDR, CRR, CRC, CPE, AmieFirst.CourtReporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/2/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2020. (ARF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply re #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ( Responses due by 5/4/2020); granting in part and denying in part #32 Motion to Compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/4/2020. (Smith, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 36 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith: MOTION HEARING held on 3/4/2020 re #28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC, Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, #32 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC, Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC. (Digital) (RN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO COURTROOM ONLY): Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 3 C before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #32 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Better Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery and Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Falcone, Vincent) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #28 Plaintiffs' Third Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Responding to #19 Defendant's MOTION to dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Declaration by Wesley Financial Group, LLC in support of #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Charles W. McDowell IV)(King, David) Modified on 2/20/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/19/2020. (JBS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Declaration in Support of #19 Dispositive Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) Modified on 2/13/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Richard Joyce. (Vieira, Olga) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Set/reset deadlines as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 2/24/2020 (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Responses due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/13/2020. (Smith, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 1/13/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Richard Joyce appointed as mediator. (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020, Discovery due by 9/18/2020, Dispositive motions due by 10/16/2020, Pretrial statement due by 1/29/2021, All other motions due by 2/5/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/30/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/14/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Bench Trial set for 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 11/6/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/3/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Responses due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/23/2019. (Smith, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Vieira, Olga) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Vieira, Olga) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Wesley Financial Group, LLC, shall file a response to the complaint on or before December 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/2/2019. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 11/27/2019 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Defendant's response to the complaint is due on December 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/12/2019. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. Related case(s): No (King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. 1) by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (King, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Wesley Financial Group, LLC shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/8/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Michelle Kramer on behalf of Wesley Financial Group, LLC (Kramer, Robyn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Falcone, III on behalf of Wesley Financial Group, LLC (Falcone, Vincent) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. King on behalf of Wesley Financial Group, LLC (King, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Central Florida Investments, Inc., Corporate Parent David Siegel Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Westgate Resorts, Inc., Other Affiliate Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Other Affiliate Westgate Lakes, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Daytona, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Towers, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Other Affiliate Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Palace, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate South Beach, LLC, Other Affiliate Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC for Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC.. (Vieira, Olga) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd., Westgate Daytona, LLC, Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC, Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC, Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC, Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC, Westgate Lakes, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC, Westgate Palace, LLC, Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Westgate South Beach, LLC, Westgate Towers, LLC, Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Vieira, Olga) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/22/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/22/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1982-Orl-40GJK. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wesley Financial Group, LLC (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16038678) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Vieira, Olga) Modified on 10/17/2019 (SJB) to correct docket text. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westgate Resorts, Ltd. et al v. Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Lakes, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Towers, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Blue Tree Orlando, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate RVS Orlando, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate GV at Painted Mountain, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Daytona, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate GV at the Woods, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate GV at Tunica, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Resorts, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Palace, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate GV at Emerald Pointe, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate South Beach, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Myrtle Beach, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Olga M. Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Robyn Michelle Kramer
Represented By: David B. King
Represented By: Vincent Falcone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?