Freshour v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Robin Freshour
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00606
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on Consent of the Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/26/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent of the Parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Callaway, Gregory)
August 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/25/2020. (Hearing lasted 00:15)(sd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL: Billy J. Marlowe of Marlowe Law Offices, PLLC is substituted for Rhonda R. (Crabtree) Meyers as counsel for the Plaintiff, Robin Freshour. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Wal-Mart Stores East,L.P. is hereby substituted as the proper named defendant in this case. The new style of the cases reflected on this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mg).
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Callaway, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Of Record by Robin Freshour. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Agreed Order)(Marlowe, Billy)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party defendant by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on August 25, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 30, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rhonda Robin Crabtree, Gregory W. Callaway. (mg)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Callaway, Gregory)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-222. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3177639) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit - State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freshour v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Freshour
Represented By: Rhonda Robin Crabtree
Represented By: Billy Joe Marlowe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?