Sanders v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Anthony Patrick Sanders
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00613
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #5 Order. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Here, jurists of reason could not disagree with the court's resolution of Sanders' motion. Accordingly, the court DENIES a COA. Sanders may still seek a COA directly from the Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. Habeas Rule 11(a). This is the final order denying all relief in this case. The Clerk SHALL enter judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/27/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Anthony Patrick Sanders. (am)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Sanders is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why his 2255 motion should not be dismissed as untimely. If Sanders claims he is entitled to equitable tolling, he must provide specific reasons, not a general statement. Sanders' response, or a written motion for an extension of time, must be received in writing by the court within 30 DAYS of the date of this order. Sanders is warned that, if he does not respond to this order by this deadline, the court may dismiss his Section 2255 motion without further order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/3/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 21, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Anthony Patrick Sanders.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Patrick Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?