King v. United States of America
Petitioner: Zachery King
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00614
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by United States of America re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Zachery King . (Safeeullah, Ahmed)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The respondent shall file an answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the motion in accordance with Rule 5 of the Section 2255 Rules within 60 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. The movant may file an optional reply to the respondent's answer limited to disputing specific points of fact or law raised by the answer within 30 DAYS of the date the answer is filed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/31/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 22, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ahmed A. Safeeullah. (dt)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brent Adams Hannafan terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/21/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Government's Notice of Substitution of Counsel) by United States of America. (Safeeullah, Ahmed)
July 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brent Adams Hannafan. (dt)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM (unsigned) of Law Supporting Facts re: #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Zachery King. (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Zachery King.(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zachery King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Ahmed A. Safeeullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?