Hall v. United States of America
Petitioner: Montez Hall
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00646
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Levine on behalf of United States of America (Levine, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Movant Montez Hall, through counsel, has filed a second or successive Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence in Accordance with 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Doc. No. #1 .) Because it is not readily apparent from the face of the motion that the movant is not now entitled to relief, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ensure that a copy of the motion and this Order are served upon the United States Attorney. The United States Attorney for this judicial district shall file an answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the motion in conformity with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings within 60 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/7/2020. (xc: Copy of this Order sent to the United States Attorney's office via inner-house mailing c/o Brent Hannafan.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 8/7/2020 (mg). Modified on 8/7/2020 (mg).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 27, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael C. Holley, Brent Adams Hannafan. (mg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Montez Hall. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Robert S. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Montez Hall
Represented By: Michael C. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?