Finch v. United States of America
Petitioner: Deunta Finch
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00653
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY filed by Deunta Finch re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by United States of America. (Holley, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Order Filing of Answer to Motion to Vacate Sentence filed by United States of America. (Dean, Rascoe)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 MOTION to Order Filing of Answer filed by Deunta Finch, Petitioner's newly appointed counsel reviewed his petition for relief under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and informed this court he did not intend to amend Petitioner's petition. (Dkt. No. 6.) The government is directed to respond to Petitioner's petition on or before September 17, 2020. Petitioner is directed to reply to Respondent on or before October 1, 2020. It is so ordered. Motion terminated: #6 . Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 8/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (hb).
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Order Filing of Answer by Deunta Finch. (Holley, Michael)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Petitioner Deunta Finch, through counsel, filed a motion for leave to substitute counsel for George Travis Hawkins. (Dkt. No. 4.) We grant that motion. Michael Holley is substituted in as counsel and George Hawkins appearance is terminated. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 8/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
July 31, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael C. Holley. (am)
July 31, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rascoe S. Dean. (am)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Appearance by Deunta Finch. (Holley, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America (Substitution of Counsel) (Dean, Rascoe)
July 30, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for George Travis Hawkins, Brent Adams Hannafan. (am)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Deunta Finch.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finch v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Rascoe S. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deunta Finch
Represented By: George Travis Hawkins
Represented By: Michael C. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?