BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. V-CAT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: V-CAT, LLC and Charles Deweese
3Rd Party Plaintiff: John Valiquette, Karen Valiquette and Aimee Valiquette
Case Number: 3:2020cv00668
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John Valiquette. (Dunham, Griffin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John Valiquette. (Dunham, Griffin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aimee Valiquette. (Dunham, Griffin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Valiquettes' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Charles Deweese, CROSSCLAIM against V-CAT, LLC by John Valiquette, Karen Valiquette, Aimee Valiquette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons to V-CAT, LLC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to Charles Deweese)(Dunham, Griffin)
September 18, 2020 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 10/26/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: This matter is presently before the Court on the joint motion of Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A., and Defendants Karen Valiquette, Aimee Valiquette, and John Valiquette to continue the initial case management conference by 35 days to October 26, 2020 to allow for an anticipated third party to participate. It appears to the Court that such request is reasonable under the circumstances. It is, accordingly, ORDERED that the initial case management conference is reset for October 26, 2020 at 11:30 am by telephone (888-557-8511, access code 7819165#). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 9/18/2020 (mg).
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Aimee Valiquette, John Valiquette, Karen Valiquette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order)(Dunham, Griffin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on September 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. #5 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to V-CAT, LLC, Aimee Valiquette, John Valiquette, and Karen Valiquette. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (mg)
August 3, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory R. Atwood. (mg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against V-CAT, LLC, Aimee Valiquette, John Valiquette, Karen Valiquette (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3187841), filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. V-CAT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John Valiquette
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Karen Valiquette
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Aimee Valiquette
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V-CAT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Deweese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Gregory R. Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?