Shoemake v. Trousdale County et al
Plaintiff: Erick B. Shoemake
Defendant: Trousdale County and CoreCivic
Case Number: 3:2020cv00672
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Erick B. Shoemake. (am)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Erick B. Shoemake. (am)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff an appropriate IFP application form. If Plaintiff wishes the Court to consider his complaint, he MUST either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or submit an IFP application using the form provided by the Clerk. Plaintiff's submission must be RECEIVED in this Court within 30 days of the entry of this Order and must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 3:20-cv-00672. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/26/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. )(Pro se party sent blank IFP (short) form by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 5, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreCivic, Trousdale County, filed by Erick B. Shoemake.(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoemake v. Trousdale County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick B. Shoemake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trousdale County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?