Radley v. Metro Police Department Nashville, TN et al
Plaintiff: Demonse Radley
Defendant: Eric Thomas and Metro Police Department Nashville, TN
Case Number: 3:2020cv00677
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Summons along with 285 Form issued as to Eric Thomas. Service copy forwarded to U.S. Marshal to effect service. (mg)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Demonse Radley, a pre-trial detainee in the custody of DSCO-DDC 2nd in Nashville, Tennessee, filed a pro se complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 (Doc. No. #1 ) against "Metro Police Department Nashville, TN" and Officer Eric Thomas. Plaintiff also filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ), and a motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. #3 ). It appears that Plaintiff lacks sufficient financial resources from which to pay the full filing fee in advance. Therefore, his application (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED send a copy of this Order to the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the DSCO-DDC 2nd in Nashville, Tennessee, to ensure that the custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account complies with that portion of 28 U.S.C. 1915 pertaining to the payment of the filing fee. For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion #8 entered contemporaneously with this Order, finds that the complaint states a Fourteenth Amendment excessive force claim and a Fourth Amendment false arrest claim under Section 1983 against Officer Thomas in his individual capacity. However, the complaint fails to state Section 1983 claims upon which relief can be granted against the Metropolitan Nashville Police Department. Therefore, those claims are DISMISSED. Consequently, the Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for the remaining Defendant. Upon return of the service packet, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE to Defendant Eric Thomas. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew, if appropriate. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/4/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a service packet (blank summons and USM 285 form) and a mailed copy of this Order to the Administrator at the DSCO-DDC 2nd in Nashville, Tennessee.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/4/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/4/2020) (mg).
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Demonse Radley. (dt)
August 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Signed Complaint was received in Clerk's Office on 8/27/2020, See DE# [1-1]. (dt)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT filed by Demonse Radley re #1 Complaint. (mg)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Demonse Radley, an inmate of DSCO-DDC 2nd in Nashville, Tennessee, has filed a pro se complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 (Doc. No. #1 ), an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ), and a motion to appoint counsel (Doc. No. #3 ). However, this case cannot proceed without further action by Plaintiff. First, Plaintiff has not signed the complaint. (Doc. No. #1 at 11). Therefore, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the original complaint to Plaintiff so that he can comply with Rule 11(a). Plaintiff, in turn, is DIRECTED to return the signed complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. Second, if seeking pauper status, a plaintiff must provide a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit the missing item within 30 days of the date this Order is entered if he wishes to proceed as a pauper. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit the full civil filing fee of $400. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/11/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with the returning of the original Complaint for signature.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 6, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Demonse Radley. (mg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Demonse Radley. (mg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro Police Department Nashville, TN, Eric Thomas, filed by Demonse Radley.(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radley v. Metro Police Department Nashville, TN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Police Department Nashville, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demonse Radley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?