Webster v. Sontara Old Hickory, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Webster
Defendant: Jacob Holm & Sonner Holding A/S, TWIG America, Inc., Sontara Old Hickory TN, Inc. and Sontara Old Hickory, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00685
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/1/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Exhibit List due by 1/14/2022. Witness List due by 1/14/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2022. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 2/26/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 9/21/2020; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :40)(jwc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Agreed to by All Parties filed by All Defendants. (Hadley, Alexandra)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jacob Holm & Sonner Holding A/S. (Hadley, Alexandra)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TWIG America, Inc.. (Hadley, Alexandra)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sontara Old Hickory, Inc.. (Hadley, Alexandra)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley on behalf of All Defendants (Hadley, Alexandra)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Anne T. Quinn on behalf of All Defendants (Quinn, Sara)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Welborn, III on behalf of All Defendants (Welborn, Joseph)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on August 19, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 10:30 a.m. on September 21, 2020, will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/2/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Scott Webster Certificate of service of Notice of Initial Case Management Conference (Edwards, James)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Richard Scott Webster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Business Entity Disclosure)(Edwards, James)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Jacob Holm & Sonner Holding A/S, Sontara Old Hickory, Inc. and TWIG America, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
August 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for James W. Edwards. (dt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacob Holm & Sonner Holding A/S, Sontara Old Hickory TN, Inc., Sontara Old Hickory, Inc. and TWIG America, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3192947), filed by Richard Scott Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated 12/17/2018, #2 Exhibit 2 - Right Eye Test Results dated 7/5/2018, #3 Exhibit 3 - Left Eye Test Result dated 7/5/2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tennessee Retina diagonisis, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ho Vision Group, PLLC Letter dated 8/12/2018, #6 Exhibit 6 - JScreen Test and Genetic Counseling Order Form from Emory University, #7 Exhibit 7 - Test Results dated 9/23/2018, #8 Exhibit 8 - Form WH-380-F provided by Long Hollow Family Practice, #9 Exhibit 9 - Progressive Direct Insuarance Co. Report, #10 Exhibit 10 - Richard Scott Webster FLMA Request dated 10/29/2018, #11 Exhibit 11 - Emails dated 11/1/2018 - 11/2/2018, #12 Exhibit 12 - Email dated 12/4/2018, #13 Exhibit 13 - FMLA certification form completed by R. Stewart Shofner MD, #14 Exhibit 14 - Separation Notice, #15 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 8/11/2020 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Sontara Old Hickory, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Webster
Represented By: James W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Holm & Sonner Holding A/S
Represented By: Sara Anne T. Quinn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWIG America, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Anne T. Quinn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sontara Old Hickory TN, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Anne T. Quinn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sontara Old Hickory, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Anne T. Quinn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?