Hill et al v. CoreCivic et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Woodard and Astin Hill
Defendant: CoreCivic and Warden (f/n/u) Leibach
Case Number: 3:2020cv00688
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff Woodard's claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with the Order of the Court and for want of prosecution. Plaintiff Hill's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is DENIED. Accordingly, within 30 days of entry of this Order, Plaintiff Hill SHALL submit the full filing fee of $400 to the Clerk of Court if he wishes to pursue this action. Plaintiff is cautioned that, should he fail to comply with this Order within the time specified, this action will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/7/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vh).
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Summary of Transactions by Astin Hill. (vh)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Astin Hill and Phillip Woodard, inmates of the Davidson County Sheriff's Office in Nashville, Tennessee, co-filed this pro se action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 against CoreCivic and Warden f/n/u Leibach. (Doc. No. #1 ). Plaintiff Hill has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. No. #2 ). However, he has not submitted a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Therefore, Plaintiff Hill MUST submit to the Court, within 30 days of entry of this Order, the missing document if he wishes to proceed as a pauper in this action. Plaintiff Woodard has not submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis or his portion of the civil filing fee. Therefore, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff Woodard a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners. Plaintiff Woodard, in turn, is DIRECTED to do one of the following within 30 days of entry of this Order: either (1) submit to the Court his portion of the civil filing fee ($175); or (2) complete the application to proceed in forma pauperis and return the completed application, along all with required documentation, to the district court. Plaintiffs cannot submit a combined application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/17/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/blank IFP to Woodard. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 12, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se parties regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.)(mg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Astin Hill. (mg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreCivic, (f/n/u) Leibach, filed by Astin Hill, Phillip Woodard.(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. CoreCivic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astin Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden (f/n/u) Leibach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?