Norris v. State of Tennessee
Petitioner: Joseph K. Norris
Respondent: State of Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2020cv00701
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Based upon the allegations made to this point, it appears that Petitioner's Section 2254 Petition is untimely. Out of an abundance of caution, the Court will give Petitioner, who is proceeding pro se, an additional opportunity to justify the timeliness of the Petition. See Shelton v. United States, 800 F.3d 292, 295 (6th Cir. 2015). Accordingly, Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the Petition should not be dismissed as untimely. If Petitioner claims he is entitled to relief from the statute of limitations, he must provide specific information and reasons, not a mere general statement. Petitioner's response, or a written motion for an extension of time, must be received in writing by the Court within 30 DAYS of the date of this Order. Petitioner is warned that the Court may dismiss the Petition without further order if the Petitioner does not respond to this Order, or request an extension or time to respond, by the deadline. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph K. Norris. (kc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Not Guilty Pleading by Joseph K. Norris. (vh)
August 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas S. Bolduc. (vh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Joseph K. Norris, a state prisoner, filed a pro se petition for a writ of habeas corpus ("Petition") under 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Doc. No. #1 .) However, Petitioner did not pay the required filing fee or file an application to proceed as a pauper. Accordingly, within 30 DAYS from the date this order is entered on the docket, Petitioner MUST either (1) submit the $5.00 filing fee, 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), or (2) submit an application to proceed as a pauper, which shall include an affidavit stating all assets petitioner possesses and that he is unable to pay the filing fee, and shall attach a certificate from the warden or other appropriate prison official showing the amount of money that he has in his inmate trust account. Rule 3(a), Rules Govg 2254 Cases. The Clerk SHALL mail Petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis application form for prisoners. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/21/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail, w/blank prisoner IFP form. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Bolduc on behalf of State of Tennessee (Bolduc, Nicholas)
August 19, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joseph K. Norris.(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph K. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bolduc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?