Tennessee Prisoners, et al. v. James, et al.
Plaintiff: Anthony Hervey, Tennessee Prisoners and Marvin Green
Defendant: Taurean James
Case Number: 3:2020cv00774
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The motion (Doc. No. #4 ) is DENIED. Nevertheless, in deference to the apparent intent of all Plaintiffs (and the expressed intent of Plaintiff Green) that these three pleadings comprise one complaint, the Court will unify these cases as follows: the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaints in Cases 774 and 775 on the record in Case 773, where all three opening pleadings may together be considered as Plaintiffs' operative pleading, and to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Cases 774 and 775. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/26/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate by Marvin Green. (dt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice mailed to pro se parties regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Taurean James, filed by Tennessee Prisoners, Marvin Green and Anthony Hervey. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Prisoners, et al. v. James, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hervey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Prisoners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurean James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?