Kalos, LLC v. White House Village, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kalos, LLC
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company, White House Village, LLC, Horizon Construction, LLC, Independence Bank of Kentucky, New Millennium Real Estate, LLC and Kentucky Property Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00812
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Fourth Motion for Enlarge Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss DE #5 . The response is due on or before 11/11/2020. Any reply is due on or before 11/18/2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/9/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Kalos, LLC. (Olson, Mark)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is granted. The response is due on November 6, 2020. The reply is due on or before November 13, 2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/6/2020. (am)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Kalos, LLC. (Olson, Mark)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The motion #11 is granted. The response is due on or before November 5, 2020. Any reply is due on or before November 12, 2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/02/2020. (ln)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Kalos, LLC. (Olson, Mark)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Courts schedule, the initial case management conference is RESET for November 18, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc. No. 4.) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint proposed case management order no later than three business days before the conference. The parties shall also email a Word version of the joint proposed case management order to Newbern_Chambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. If the proposed order cannot be submitted on time, or if all parties have not yet appeared, plaintiff's counsel is responsible for contacting the Magistrate Judges chambers to reschedule the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/29/2020. (am)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Motion to Enlarge Time #8 to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #5 is granted. The response is due on or before 10/30/2020. Any reply is due on or before 11/6/2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Kalos, LLC. (Olson, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On October 5, 2020, Defendants White House Village, LLC; Kentucky Property Management, LLC; Horizon Construction, LLC; Arch Insurance Company; and New Millennium Real Estate, LLC filed a motion to dismiss Counts I, II, and IV of Plaintiff Kalos, LLC's complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. 5.) Under Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), any response in opposition must be filed and served within fourteen days of service of the motion. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01(a)(3) (response). An optional reply may be filed and served within seven days of service of a response. M.D. Tenn. R. 7.01 (a)(4) (reply). Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/6/2020. (am)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arch Insurance Company, Horizon Construction, LLC, Kentucky Property Management, LLC, New Millennium Real Estate, LLC, White House Village, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Lien Discharge Bond)(Irvin, J.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Arch Insurance Company, Horizon Construction, LLC, Kentucky Property Management, LLC, New Millennium Real Estate, LLC, White House Village, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Lien Discharge Bond)(Irvin, J.)
September 23, 2020 (TN & TNMD) State Bar status verified as active for Lucas A. Davidson, Mark Robert Olson admitted to this court. (am)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Insurance Company, Horizon Construction, LLC, Independence Bank of Kentucky, Kentucky Property Management, LLC, New Millennium Real Estate, LLC, White House Village, LLC from Sumner County Chancery Court, case number 19CV164. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3218645) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #3 Attachment - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalos, LLC v. White House Village, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalos, LLC
Represented By: Mark Robert Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Represented By: J. Wallace Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White House Village, LLC
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Represented By: J. Wallace Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Construction, LLC
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Represented By: J. Wallace Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Bank of Kentucky
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Millennium Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Represented By: J. Wallace Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Lucas A. Davidson
Represented By: J. Wallace Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?