Wild v. Nashville Pest Control, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Lewis Wild
Defendant: Nashville Pest Control, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00849
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Nashville Pest Control, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 1, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Morton Novick admitted to this court. (dt)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alexander Lewis Wild. (dt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nashville Pest Control, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3225667), filed by Alexander Lewis Wild. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Attachment - Form AO121, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. Nashville Pest Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Lewis Wild
Represented By: Daniel Morton Novick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashville Pest Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?