Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC et al v. Rutherford County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Judy Denny doing business as Norton Bonding, Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC, Paul R. Williams, Scott Hurst doing business as Hurst Bail Bonding, AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC, Ronnie Carter doing business as Freebird Bail Bonds and Amber R. Williams doing business as Jail Busters
Defendant: Jennings Jones, Rutherford County, Tennessee, The 16th Judicial District of Tennessee and 16th Judicial District of Tennessee, The
Case Number: 3:2020cv00923
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Scott Hurst, Amber R. Williams, Ronnie Carter, Judy Denny, Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC, Paul R. Williams, AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC. 16th Judicial District of Tennessee, The served on 12/14/2020. (Moseley, James)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Scott Hurst, Amber R. Williams, Ronnie Carter, Judy Denny, Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC, Paul R. Williams, AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC. Jennings Jones served on 12/14/2020. (Moseley, James)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Scott Hurst, Amber R. Williams, Ronnie Carter, Judy Denny, Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC, Paul R. Williams, AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC. Rutherford County, Tennessee served on 12/14/2020. (Moseley, James)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management inaccordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons issued as to Jennings Jones, Rutherford County, Tennessee, The 16th Judicial District of Tennessee. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Joel H. Moseley, Jr, James B. Moseley admitted to this court. (am)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Judy Denny d/b/a Norton Bonding. (am)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC. (am)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ronnie Carter d/b/a Freedbird Bail Bonds. (am)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT d/b/a Hurst Bail Bonding filed by Scott Hurst. (am) Modified Text on 10/28/2020 (am).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amber R. Williams, Paul R. Williams d/b/a Jail Busters. (am)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC. (am)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennings Jones, Rutherford County, Tennessee, The 16th Judicial District of Tennessee (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3244572), filed by Scott Hurst, Amber R. Williams, Ronnie Carter, Judy Denny, Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC, Paul R. Williams, AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC et al v. Rutherford County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Denny doing business as Norton Bonding
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grumpy's Bail Bonds, LLC
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R. Williams
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hurst doing business as Hurst Bail Bonding
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAAA Bail Bonding, LLC
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Carter doing business as Freebird Bail Bonds
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber R. Williams doing business as Jail Busters
Represented By: Joel H. Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 16th Judicial District of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16th Judicial District of Tennessee, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?