Davis v. Baier et al
Plaintiff: Brian Davis
Defendant: Denise W. Warren, T. Andrew Smith, Mark J. Parrell, Lucinda M. Baier, Jackie M. Clegg, William G. Petty, Jr., Marcus E. Bromley, Steven E. Swain, Frank M. Bumstead, Daniel A. Decker, Brookdale Senior Living Inc., Guy P. Sansone, Rita Johnson-Mills, Jeffrey R. Leeds, James R. Seward and Lee S. Wielansky
Case Number: 3:2020cv00929
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 OH State Bar status verified as active for Geoffrey J. Ritts not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg) Modified on 12/23/2020 (mg).
December 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Briana T. Sprick Schuster and Britt K. Latham admitted to this court. (mg) Modified on 12/23/2020 (mg).
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Davis. Daniel A. Decker waiver sent on 12/17/2020. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Davis. William G. Petty, Jr waiver sent on 12/17/2020. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 22, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Davis. Denise W. Warren waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Lee S. Wielansky waiver sent on 12/17/2020. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Geoffrey J. Ritts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3279424) by Lucinda M. Baier, Marcus E. Bromley, Brookdale Senior Living Inc., Frank M. Bumstead, Jackie M. Clegg, Daniel A. Decker, Rita Johnson-Mills, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Mark J. Parrell, William G. Petty, Jr, Guy P. Sansone, James R. Seward, T. Andrew Smith, Steven E. Swain, Denise W. Warren, Lee S. Wielansky. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Latham, Britt)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana T. Sprick Schuster on behalf of Lucinda M. Baier, Marcus E. Bromley, Brookdale Senior Living Inc., Frank M. Bumstead, Jackie M. Clegg, Daniel A. Decker, Rita Johnson-Mills, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Mark J. Parrell, William G. Petty, Jr, Guy P. Sansone, James R. Seward, T. Andrew Smith, Steven E. Swain, Denise W. Warren, Lee S. Wielansky (Sprick Schuster, Briana)
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Britt K. Latham on behalf of Lucinda M. Baier, Marcus E. Bromley, Brookdale Senior Living Inc., Frank M. Bumstead, Jackie M. Clegg, Daniel A. Decker, Rita Johnson-Mills, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Mark J. Parrell, William G. Petty, Jr, Guy P. Sansone, James R. Seward, T. Andrew Smith, Steven E. Swain, Denise W. Warren, Lee S. Wielansky (Latham, Britt)
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Davis. Brookdale Senior Living Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Mark J. Parrell waiver sent on 12/17/2020. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Davis. Lucinda M. Baier waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Marcus E. Bromley waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Frank M. Bumstead waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Jackie M. Clegg waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Rita Johnson-Mills waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Jeffrey R. Leeds waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Guy P. Sansone waiver sent on 12/17/2020; James R. Seward waiver sent on 12/17/2020; T. Andrew Smith waiver sent on 12/17/2020; Steven E. Swain waiver sent on 12/17/2020. (Bramlett, Paul)
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 Summons issued as to Marcus E. Bromley, Frank M. Bumstead, Jackie M. Clegg, Daniel A. Decker, Rita Johnson-Mills, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Mark J. Parrell, William G. Petty, Jr, Guy P. Sansone, James R. Seward, T. Andrew Smith, Steven E. Swain, Denise W. Warren, Lee S. Wielansky. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Paul Brumlett) by mail. (mg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Brian Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Smith-Summons, #2 Attachment Swain-Summons, #3 Attachment Bromley-Summons, #4 Attachment Bumstead-Summons, #5 Attachment Clegg-Summons, #6 Attachment Decker-Summons, #7 Attachment Johnson-Mills-Summons, #8 Attachment Leeds-Summons, #9 Attachment Parrell-Summons, #10 Attachment Petty-Summons, #11 Attachment Sansone-Summons, #12 Attachment Seward-Summons, #13 Attachment Warren-Summons, #14 Attachment Wielansky-Summons)(Bramlett, Paul)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy William Brown is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/1/2020. (vk)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Phillip Kim is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/1/2020. (vk)
December 1, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Timothy W. Brown not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (bs)
December 1, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Phillip Kim not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (bs)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Timothy William Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3255997) by Brian Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Bramlett, Paul)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3255987) by Brian Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Bramlett, Paul)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon the transfer of this case to Judge Trauger (Doc. No. 6), it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before him on January 14, 2021 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset to 1/25/2021 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/12/2020. (kc)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-00543. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/10/2020. (kc)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/02/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
October 29, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Phillip Kim and Timothy W. Brown: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/19/2020. (kc)
October 29, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Kent Bramlett and Robert P. Bramlett admitted to this court. (kc)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lucinda M. Baier, Marcus E. Bromley, Brookdale Senior Living Inc., Frank M. Bumstead, Jackie M. Clegg, Daniel A. Decker, Rita Johnson-Mills, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Mark J. Parrell, William G. Petty, Jr, Guy P. Sansone, James R. Seward, T. Andrew Smith, Steven E. Swain, Denise W. Warren, and Lee S. Wielansky (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3245714), filed by Brian Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 2 CCSa Additional Defendants, #3 Attachment 3 CCSb Additional Attorneys, #4 Attachment 4 Plaintiff's Verification)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Baier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise W. Warren
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Andrew Smith
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Parrell
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda M. Baier
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie M. Clegg
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Petty, Jr.
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus E. Bromley
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Swain
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank M. Bumstead
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Decker
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Inc.
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy P. Sansone
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Johnson-Mills
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Leeds
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Seward
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Briana T. Sprick Schuster
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee S. Wielansky
Represented By: Britt K Latham
Represented By: Britt K. Latham
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Davis
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Robert P. Bramlett
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Timothy W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?