United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995 v. The Kroger Company, et al.
Plaintiff: United Food & Commercial Workers and United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995
Defendant: The Kroger Company and Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 3:2020cv00948
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard C. Paul admitted to this court. (jm)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendants The Kroger Company and Kroger Limited Partnership I ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by The Kroger Company.(Paul, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Mills is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/17/20. (vk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against The Kroger Company, filed by United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Grievance Dated 06_05_2020, #3 Exhibit C - Company Response Dated 06_09_2020, #4 Exhibit D - Company Responses 6_30_2020 and 7_14_2020, #5 Attachment Summons for Kroger Limited Partnership I)(Garrison, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order OH State Bar status verified as active for James A. Mills not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for attorney James A. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3273659) by The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Kroger Company. (Paul, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Kroger Company.(Paul, Richard)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Plaintiff's motion to exempt this case. This case is exempted from mandatory initial case management. However, the January 12, 2021 conference shall remain on the docket and shall proceed as a status conference rather than an initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (hb).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/12/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/3/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jm). Modified on 12/3/2020 (bs).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION Motion to Exempt Case From Mandatory Initial Case Management Conference by United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995. (Tift, Scott)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing by United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995 re #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Exhibits to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Grievance Dated 06_05_2020, #3 Exhibit C - Company Response Dated 06_09_2020, #4 Exhibit D - Company Responses 6_30_2020 and 7_14_2020)(Tift, Scott)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995. The Kroger Company served on 11/20/2020. (Garrison, David)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to The Kroger Company. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (kc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Kroger Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3249108), filed by United Food & Commercial Workers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for David W. Garrison, Scott P. Tift and Joshua A. Frank admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995 v. The Kroger Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Represented By: James A. Mills
Represented By: Richard C. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food & Commercial Workers
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 1995
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?