Fox v. A. Murgas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Fox
Defendant: Air Assault Pizza, LLC and A. Murgas LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00983
Filed: November 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A. Murgas LLC, Air Assault Pizza, LLC.(Nolan, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Mark Nolan, Tracy P. Knight admitted to this court. (am)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer A. Murgas LLC answer due 12/28/2020; Air Assault Pizza, LLC answer due 12/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by A. Murgas LLC, Air Assault Pizza, LLC. (Nolan, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy P. Knight on behalf of A. Murgas LLC, Air Assault Pizza, LLC (Nolan, Daniel) Modified Text on 12/7/2020 (am).
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Nolan on behalf of A. Murgas LLC, Air Assault Pizza, LLC (Nolan, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on November 30, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on January 19, 2021, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/03/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Jamie Fox. Air Assault Pizza, LLC served on 11/20/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Jamie Fox. A. Murgas LLC served on 11/20/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to A. Murgas LLC, Air Assault Pizza, LLC. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
November 16, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anne Hunter, Ashley S. Walter, and Heather M. Collins admitted to this court. (jm)
November 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
November 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
November 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. Murgas LLC and Air Assault Pizza, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3256683), filed by Jamie Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Judgment - Craig)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. A. Murgas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Assault Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Tracy P. Knight
Represented By: Daniel Mark Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Murgas LLC
Represented By: Daniel Mark Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Fox
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Represented By: Ashley S. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?