Whitehead Electric Company v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Whitehead Electric Company
Defendant: Zurich Agency Services doing business as Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. doing business as Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00986
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Zurich Agency Services re #9 Answer to Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Zurich Agency Services. (Dodson, Jack)
January 14, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Zurich Agency Services.(Dodson, Jack)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney S. Leo Arnold terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/09/2020. (ln)
December 9, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 and #7 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE conformed Certificates of Service for these documents. (ln) Modified on 12/9/2020 (ln).
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Whitehead Electric Company. (Willis, Matthew)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Leo Arnold by Whitehead Electric Company. (Willis, Matthew)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL S. Leo Arnold: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 12/7/2020. (ln)
November 16, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jack Robinson Dodson, III, Ryan Allan Lee, and Matthew W. Willis admitted to this court. (ln)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. and Zurich Agency Services from Rutherford County Circuit Court, case number 77697. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0650-3257247). (Attachments: #(1) Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #(3) Exhibit B - Defendants' Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal, #(4) Exhibit C - Defendants' Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal).(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead Electric Company v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich Agency Services doing business as Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Jack Robinson Dodson, III
Represented By: Ryan Allan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. doing business as Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack Robinson Dodson, III
Represented By: Ryan Allan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitehead Electric Company
Represented By: S. Leo Arnold
Represented By: Matthew W. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?