Bell et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Marquinta Bell and Eric Bell
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00987
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/09/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/09/2020. (ln)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order Agreed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed order)(Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
November 17, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alexandria Scarbrough Fisher, Matthew J. Evans, Frank Wilbert, and Nina M. Eiler admitted to this court. (ln)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (ln)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 20C2072. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0650-3257469). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Declarations of Matthew Evans and Nina Eiler, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Clerk and Court, #4 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet).(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquinta Bell
Represented By: Alexandria Scarbrough Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bell
Represented By: Alexandria Scarbrough Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans
Represented By: Frank Wilbert
Represented By: Nina M. Eiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?