Allen v. Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC
Plaintiff: Cindy Allen
Defendant: Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00996
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Cindy Allen. (Hall, G.)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC. (Rodgers, John)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC.(Lonergan, Matthew)
January 4, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew C. Lonergan and John P. Rodgers admitted to this court. (ln)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Rodgers on behalf of Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC (Rodgers, John)
December 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Lonergan on behalf of Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC (Lonergan, Matthew)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on November 30, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 1:30 p.m. on January 19, 2021, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/03/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/19/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel (G. Brandon Hall) by mail. (ln)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
November 18, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for G. Brandon Hall and Jonathan A. Street admitted to this court. (ln)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3258452) filed by Cindy Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet).(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Lonergan
Represented By: John P. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Allen
Represented By: G. Brandon Hall
Represented By: Jonathan A. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?