New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC v. O'Connell et al
Plaintiff: New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC
Defendant: Wayne O'Connell and Gabrielle O'Connell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00021
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Stipulation is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the time for Defendants to file an answer is hereby extended to and including April 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/9/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Since no notice of appearance has been filed for the defendant in this case, the Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for March 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby RESET for April 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/8/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint by New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Roth, Blake)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC. Wayne O'Connell served on 1/28/2021. (Roth, Blake)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Gabrielle O'Connell on 01/16/2021, filed by New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC. (Roth, Blake)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/14/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Gabrielle O'Connell, Wayne O'Connell. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
January 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Blake Daniel Roth admitted to this court. (kc)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC. (kc)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gabrielle O'Connell and Wayne O'Connell (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3290864), filed by New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC. (kc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2021: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A First Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B Second Promissory Note) (kc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC v. O'Connell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hope Farm of Nelson County, LLC
Represented By: Blake Daniel Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?