Smart Communications Holding, Inc. v. VendEngine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Smart Communications Holding, Inc.
Defendant: VendEngine, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00053
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Charles C. McLaurin on behalf of VendEngine, Inc.. (McLaurin, Charles)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's response (Doc. No. #25 ) to Defendant's Motion to Seal (Doc. No. #9 ) and Defendant's indication that is does not request restriction of public access to the document (see Doc. No. #9 at 1), Defendant's Motion to Seal (Doc. No. #9 ) is DENIED, and the Clerk shall unseal Doc. No. #10 . Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 04/01/2021. (ln)
March 31, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Smart Communications Holding, Inc.. (Barger, Keane)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Pending before the Court, among other things, is Defendant's Motion to Seal (Doc. No. #9 , Motion). Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion by April 9, 2021, indicating whether it contends that these documents should remain under seal and, if so, how it carries its burden of meeting the requirements of Local Rule 5.03(a). See Local Rule 5.03(b). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/26/2021. (ln)
March 24, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony F. Schlehuber (Schlehuber, Anthony)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference set for March 23, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Conference will be rescheduled, if necessary, after the Court rules on the Motion to Remand (Docket No. #14 ). Please contact the undersigned's chambers to reschedule within fourteen (14) days of a ruling on the Motion if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/15/2021. (vh)
March 8, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Smart Communications Holding, Inc.. (Reynolds, Gregory)
February 26, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by VendEngine, Inc. (Schlehuber, Anthony) Modified on 3/1/2021 (vh).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Parties' Motion for Extension of Briefing Deadlines #18 is GRANTED. Defendant VendEngine, Inc. shall have up to and including February 26, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff Smart Communications Holding, Inc.'s motion for remand #14 and Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 8, 2021 to reply. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/23/2021. (vh)
February 22, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by VendEngine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Proposed Order)(Schlehuber, Anthony)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to Stay until Ruling on Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/17/2021. (vh)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay by Smart Communications Holding, Inc.. (Barger, Keane)
February 10, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Smart Communications Holding, Inc. . (Barger, Keane)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Smart Communications Holding, Inc.. (Barger, Keane)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: After consultation with Judge Eli Richardson, this action is TRANSFERRED to Judge Richardson as an earlier-filed related case to HLFIP Holding, Inc. v Rutherford County, Tennessee, et al., Case No. 3:19-cv-00714. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/1/2021. (vh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by VendEngine, Inc.. (Ramage, Wayne)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Anthony Schlehuber filed by VendEngine, Inc. re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B- US Patent 10291617, #2 Exhibit C- US Patent Application 15153171)(Ramage, Wayne)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 Sealed Document filed by VendEngine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- NDA)(Ramage, Wayne)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by VendEngine, Inc.. (Ramage, Wayne)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by VendEngine, Inc.. (Ramage, Wayne)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/27/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VendEngine, Inc. re #2 Business Entity Disclosure Statement (Ramage, Wayne)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
January 25, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (vh)
January 25, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory S. Reynolds, Keane A. Barger, Wayne Edward Ramage, Anthony F. Schlehuber admitted to this court. (vh)
January 25, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Katrina M. Quicker, Kevin P. Flynn: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/16/2021. (vh)
January 25, 2021 State Bar status verified as active for (GA) Katrina M. Quicker, (OH) Kevin P. Flynn not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (vh)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VendEngine, Inc. (vh)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VendEngine, Inc. from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20-1281-I. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3300140) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - remaining state docs, #3 Exhibit C - 714 Rutherford Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - 111 First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - 111 Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to Consolidate, #7 Exhibit G - 714 VE Complaint, #8 Exhibit H - Notice to State Court and cover letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart Communications Holding, Inc. v. VendEngine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Communications Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory S. Reynolds
Represented By: Kevin P. Flynn
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Keane A. Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VendEngine, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne Edward Ramage
Represented By: Anthony F. Schlehuber
Represented By: Charles C. McLaurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?