Accord v. Anderson County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Gary Accord
Defendant: Henderson County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Hamilton County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Coffee County, Tennessee, Shelby County, Tennessee, Sullivan County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Davidson County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Warren County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Sumner County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Obion County, Tennessee, Blount County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Hancock County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Knox County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Anderson County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Rutherford County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Greene County, Tennessee, Williamson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Putnam County, Tennessee and Dekalb County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2021cv00077
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Neill Southerland on behalf of Hamilton County, Tennessee (Southerland, Mary)
April 1, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon McMullan Milling on behalf of Hamilton County, Tennessee (Milling, Sharon)
April 1, 2021 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Blount County, Tennessee.(Prince, Gary)
April 1, 2021 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee. (Knight, Arthur)
April 1, 2021 Filing 68 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee. Amendment to #19 Notice of Appearance, #26 Amended Document,, Second. (Knight, Arthur)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: MOTION #63 for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading GRANTED. Hancock County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/30/2021. (ln)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: MOTION #58 for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading GRANTED. Hamilton County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/30/2021. (ln)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: MOTION #56 for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading GRANTED. Bradley County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Campbell County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Carroll County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Cheatham County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Claiborne County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Clay County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Cumberland County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Decatur County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Dekalb County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Dickson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Dyer County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Fayette County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Fentress County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Gibson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Giles County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Grainger County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Grundy County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Hardin County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Hawkins County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Haywood County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Houston County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Jackson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Johnson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Lake County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Lawrence County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Lewis County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Lincoln County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Macon County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Madison County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Marion County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Marshall County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Maury County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; McNairy County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Montgomery County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Overton County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Perry County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Pickett County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Polk County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Robertson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Sevier County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Smith County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Tipton County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Unicoi County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Van Buren County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Washington County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Wayne County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Weakley County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/30/2021. (ln)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: MOTION #53 for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint GRANTED. Coffee County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Roane County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021; Wilson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/30/2021. (ln)
March 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brad A. Fraser admitted to this court. (ln)
March 30, 2021 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hancock County, Tennessee. (Fraser, Brad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A. Fraser on behalf of Hancock County, Tennessee (Fraser, Brad)
March 30, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#60 , #61 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificates of service or include all Counsel on the certificates of service. Please FILE conformed Certificates of Service for these documents. (ln)
March 30, 2021 LA State Bar status verified as active for Andrea Leigh Barient not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 30, 2021 LA State Bar status verified as active for Patrick W. Pendley not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 29, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for attorney Andrea Barient to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Gary Accord. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ball, Gordon)
March 29, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for attorney Patrick W. Pendley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Gary Accord. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ball, Gordon)
March 29, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon McMullan Milling on behalf of Hamilton County, Tennessee (Milling, Sharon)
March 29, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for James I. Pentecost admitted to this court. (ln)
March 29, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Austin Stokes, Nathan D. Tilly, and Jeffrey R. Thompson admitted to this court. (ln)
March 27, 2021 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Southerland, Mary)
March 27, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Neill Southerland on behalf of Hamilton County, Tennessee (Southerland, Mary)
March 26, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (to replace [DE 54]) by Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee. (Stokes, J.) Modified on 3/29/2021 (ln).
March 26, 2021 Filing 55 AMENDED NOTICE #49 OF APPEARANCE by Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee. (Pentecost, James)
March 26, 2021 Filing 54 ***DISREGARD. INCOMPLETE MOTION.*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee. (Stokes, J.) Modified on 3/29/2021 (ln).
March 26, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Coffee County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee. (Thompson, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Thompson on behalf of Coffee County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee (Thompson, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Tilly on behalf of Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee (Tilly, Nathan)
March 26, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Austin Stokes on behalf of Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee (Stokes, J.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 49 ***DISREGARD. INCOMPLETE NOTICE.*** NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Pentecost on behalf of Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee (Pentecost, James) Modified on 3/29/2021 (ln).
March 26, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas B. Russell, Leah May Dennen, Sarah L. Locker, William C. Scales, Jr, and Benjamin C. Allen admitted to this court. (ln)
March 26, 2021 Filing 44 Corrected NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Michael Prince on behalf of Blount County, Tennessee (Prince, Gary)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: MOTION #43 for Extension of Time GRANTED. Sumner County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/25/2021. (ln)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: MOTION #37 for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading GRANTED. Davidson County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/25/2021. (ln)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: MOTION #35 for Extension of Time to Answer GRANTED. Bledsoe County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/25/2021.(ln)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: MOTION #33 for Extension of Time to Answer GRANTED. Warren County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/25/2021. (ln)
March 25, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sumner County, Tennessee. (Russell, Thomas)
March 25, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Allen on behalf of Sumner County, Tennessee (Allen, Benjamin)
March 25, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Scales, Jr on behalf of Sumner County, Tennessee (Scales, William)
March 25, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah L. Locker on behalf of Sumner County, Tennessee (Locker, Sarah)
March 25, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah May Dennen on behalf of Sumner County, Tennessee (Dennen, Leah)
March 25, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Russell on behalf of Sumner County, Tennessee (Russell, Thomas)
March 25, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Davidson County, Tennessee. (Bussell, Allison)
March 25, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE by Knox County, Tennessee re #34 Notice of Appearance Amended with Corrected Certificate of Service (Jernigan-Johnson, Jessica)
March 25, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bledsoe County, Tennessee. (Upchurch, Howard)
March 25, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#34 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
March 24, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Jernigan-Johnson on behalf of Knox County, Tennessee (Jernigan-Johnson, Jessica)
March 24, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Oliver Bratcher admitted to this court. (ln)
March 23, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Warren County, Tennessee. (Bratcher, Robert)
March 23, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Oliver Bratcher on behalf of Warren County, Tennessee (Bratcher, Robert)
March 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lisa M. Carson admitted to this court. (ln)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
March 23, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#25 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
March 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gary Michael Prince admitted to this court. (ln)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Putnam County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/23/2021. (ln)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Rutherford County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/23/2021.(ln)
March 22, 2021 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Williamson County, Tennessee. (Carson, Lisa)
March 22, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Carson on behalf of Williamson County, Tennessee (Carson, Lisa)
March 22, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED AND CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Amendment to #19 Notice of Appearance) by Anderson County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee. (Knight, Arthur) Modified on 3/23/2021 (ln).
March 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Michael Prince on behalf of Blount County, Tennessee (Prince, Gary)
March 19, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas Clinton Christiansen admitted to this court. (ln)
March 19, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Howard L. Upchurch admitted to this court. (ln)
March 19, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey G. Jones admitted to this court. (ln)
March 19, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Putnam County, Tennessee. (Jones, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rutherford County, Tennessee. (Christiansen, Nicholas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Clinton Christiansen on behalf of Rutherford County, Tennessee (Christiansen, Nicholas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard L. Upchurch on behalf of Bledsoe County, Tennessee (Upchurch, Howard)
March 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Jones on behalf of Putnam County, Tennessee (Jones, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Arthur F. Knight, III admitted to this court. (ln)
March 15, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
March 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur F. Knight, III on behalf of Morgan County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee (Knight, Arthur)
March 12, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Patrick W. Pendley: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/2/2021. (ln)
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gordon Ball (Ball, Gordon)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: MOTION #16 for Extension of Time to Answer GRANTED. Shelby County, Tennessee's answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
March 11, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Marshall Jones admitted to this court. (ln)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Shelby County, Tennessee. (Jones, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Marshall Jones on behalf of Shelby County, Tennessee (Jones, John)
March 8, 2021 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 7/7/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: MOTION #13 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to July 7, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 03/08/2021.(ln)
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Mgmt Conf by Gary Accord. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Gordon Ball)(Ball, Gordon)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Sullivan County, Tennessee, Sumner County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Warren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee, Williamson County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee.(Services copies return by mail.) (bs)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 Summons issued as to Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Blount County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Coffee County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Davidson County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Greene County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hamilton County, Tennessee, Hancock County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 Summons issued as to Obion County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Putnam County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Rutherford County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Shelby County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, and Stewart County, Tennessee. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Hickman County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Knox County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, and Morgan County, Tennessee. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Sullivan County, Tennessee, Sumner County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Warren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee, Williamson County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee. (Ball, Gordon)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Hickman County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Knox County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Obion County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Putnam County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Rutherford County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Shelby County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee. (Ball, Gordon)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Blount County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Coffee County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Davidson County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Greene County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hamilton County, Tennessee, Hancock County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee. (Ball, Gordon)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 02/04/021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Gary Accord Notice of Filing Description of Exhibits (Ball, Gordon)
February 3, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon Ball admitted to this court. (ln)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
February 3, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ln)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Blount County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Coffee County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Davidson County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Greene County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hamilton County, Tennessee, Hancock County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Knox County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Obion County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Putnam County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Rutherford County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Shelby County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Sullivan County, Tennessee, Sumner County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Warren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee, Williamson County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3305930) filed by Gary Accord. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet).(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accord v. Anderson County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County, Tennessee
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffee County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County, Tennessee
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unicoi County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Allison L. Bussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weakley County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyer County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren County, Tennessee
Represented By: Robert Oliver Bratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickett County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequatchie County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giles County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trousdale County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhea County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayette County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner County, Tennessee
Represented By: William C. Scales, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah L. Locker
Represented By: Leah May Dennen
Represented By: Benjamin C. Allen
Represented By: Thomas B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grundy County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obion County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount County, Tennessee
Represented By: Gary Michael Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hancock County, Tennessee
Represented By: Brad A. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauderdale County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocke County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tipton County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crockett County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fentress County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claiborne County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickson County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jessica Jernigan-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decatur County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNairy County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meigs County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheatham County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roane County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loudon County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bledsoe County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: Howard L. Upchurch
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humphreys County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overton County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedford County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardeman County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County, Tennessee
Represented By: Nicholas Clinton Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawkins County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Lisa M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sevier County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grainger County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMinn County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickman County, Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F. Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dekalb County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Represented By: J. Austin Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Accord
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: Patrick W. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?