Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. et al v. Hallmark Lighting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. and V. Alexander & Co. Inc.
Defendant: De Rosa Lamparts LLC doing business as Luminance Brands, Amit Dixit, Hallmark Lighting, LLC and Hallmark Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00129
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on American DeRosa Lamparts, LLC on 02/25/21, filed by V. Alexander & Co. Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Hallmark Lighting, LLC on 02/24/21, filed by V. Alexander & Co. Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Hallmark Hospitality, LLC on 02/23/21, filed by V. Alexander & Co. Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Amit Dixit on 02/25/21, filed by V. Alexander & Co. Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brendan Collins is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/2/2021.(vk)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 23, 2021 D.C. Bar status verified as active for Brendan Collins not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Brendan Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3317871) by V. Alexander & Co. Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Clemons, James)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Amit Dixit, De Rosa Lamparts LLC, Hallmark Hospitality, LLC, Hallmark Lighting, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
February 19, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Michael Clemons, and John R. Clemmons admitted to this court. (mg)
February 19, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (mg)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by V. Alexander & Co. Inc. (mg)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. (mg)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amit Dixit, De Rosa Lamparts LLC, Hallmark Hospitality, LLC, Hallmark Lighting, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3316177), filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc., V. Alexander & Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. et al v. Hallmark Lighting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Rosa Lamparts LLC doing business as Luminance Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Dixit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark Lighting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Clemons
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. Alexander & Co. Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Clemons
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?