Tremblay v. Clover Health Investments, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jean-Nicolas Tremblay
Defendant: Clover Health Investments, Corp., Vivek Garipalli, Social Capital Hedosophia Holdings Corp. III, Chamath Palihapitiya, James Ryans, Steven Trieu, Andrew Toy, Ian Osborne and Jacqueline D. Reses
Petitioner: Christopher Bunton and The Investor Group
Case Number: 3:2021cv00138
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is CONSOLIDATED for all purposes with the case of Timothy Bond v. Clover Health Investments Corp, et al., Case No. 3:21-cv-96. ALL FILINGS IN THE CONSOLIDATED CASES SHALL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/8/2021. (ln)
April 6, 2021 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Charles F. Barrett filed by The Investor Group re: #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency of Action, #2 Exhibit B - The Investor Group members' PSLRA Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration in Support of the Motion of the Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, #5 Exhibit E - Certificate from Women's Business Enterprise National Council, #6 Exhibit F - Firm Resume of Neal & Harwell, PLC)(Barrett, Charles)
April 6, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by The Investor Group . (Barrett, Charles)
April 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by The Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Barrett, Charles)
April 6, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jeffrey C. Block filed by Christopher Bunton re: #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rosen PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Bunton LP Cert. (signed), #3 Exhibit C - Clover Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Bunton LP Decl. (signed), #5 Exhibit E - Block Leviton Resume, #6 Exhibit F - BSJ Firm Resume)(Stranch, James)
April 6, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Christopher Bunton . (Stranch, James)
April 6, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Christopher Bunton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Corey Holzer is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/28/21. (vk)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Lieberman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/28/21. (vk)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Alexander Hood II is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/28/21. (vk)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick V. Dahlstrom is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/28/21. (vk)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Upon the transfer of this case to Judge Trauger (Doc. No. #7 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before him on April 27, 2021 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her on May 17, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/15/2021. (jm)
March 15, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood, II, Patrick V. Dahlstrom; GA State Bar status verified as active for Corey D. Holzer not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Corey Holzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3331061) by Jean-Nicolas Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Bramlett, Paul)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon a Motion filed on behalf of James M. LoPiano to be allowed to withdraw as counsel. For good cause shown, the #11 motion is hereby granted. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/12/2021. (jm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jean-Nicolas Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Bramlett, Paul)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3330709) by Jean-Nicolas Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Lieberman, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Bramlett, Paul)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney J. Alexander Hood II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3330707) by Jean-Nicolas Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Hood, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Bramlett, Paul)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3330702) by Jean-Nicolas Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Dahlstrom, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Bramlett, Paul)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this case is transferred to United States District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as related to Case No. 3:21-cv- 00101. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/1/2021. (Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. District Judge Eli J. Richardson no longer assigned to case.) (jm)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Clover Health Investments, Corp., Vivek Garipalli, Ian Osborne, Chamath Palihapitiya, Jacqueline D. Reses, James Ryans, Andrew Toy, and Steven Trieu. (Service copies sent to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
February 24, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Kent Bramlett and Robert P. Bramlett admitted to this court. (jm)
February 24, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood, II, and James M. LoPiano; IL State Bar status verified as active for Patrick V. Dahlstrom; GA State Bar status verified as active for Corey D. Holzer not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood, II, James M. LoPiano, Patrick V. Dahlstrom, Corey D. Holzer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/17/2021. (jm)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3318548), filed by Jean-Nicolas Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Plaintiff's Certification, #3 Exhibit A-Schedule of Purchases)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tremblay v. Clover Health Investments, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clover Health Investments, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek Garipalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Capital Hedosophia Holdings Corp. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamath Palihapitiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ryans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Trieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline D. Reses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Nicolas Tremblay
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Robert P. Bramlett
Represented By: Corey D. Holzer
Represented By: James M. LoPiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Bunton
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Investor Group
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?