Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc. v. M Vince Nail Spa, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc. doing business as M. Vince Nail Spa
Defendant: Binh T. Nguyen, M Vince Nail Spa, LLC, Raymond T. Do and MT Vince Nail Spa, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00366
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Thomas McFarland, #2 Attachment - proposed Entry of Default as to M Vince Nail Spa L.L.C, #3 Attachment - proposed Entry of Default as to Binh T. Nguyen, #4 Attachment - proposed Entry of Default as to MT Vince Nail Spa L.L.C., #5 Attachment - proposed Entry of Default as to Raymond T. Do)(McFarland, Marshall)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. Raymond T. Do served on 5/19/2021. (McFarland, Marshall)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. MT Vince Nail Spa, LLC served on 5/19/2021. (McFarland, Marshall)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. M Vince Nail Spa, LLC served on 5/22/2021. (McFarland, Marshall)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. Binh T. Nguyen served on 5/22/2021. (McFarland, Marshall)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 and #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Alexandra Rose and Jeiel Noh to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/24/2021.(lh)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jeiel Noh from the United States District Court for the Northern of Illinois filed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. (McFarland, Marshall)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Alexandra Nicole Rose from the United States District Court for the Northern of Texas filed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. (McFarland, Marshall)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ln)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order State Bar status verified as active for Alexandra Rose (TX and CO), Jeiel Noh (IL) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ln)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Jeiel Noh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3372350) by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Noh, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(McFarland, Marshall)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Alexandra Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3372308) by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of A. Rose, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(McFarland, Marshall)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued as to Raymond T. Do, M Vince Nail Spa, LLC, MT Vince Nail Spa, LLC, and Binh T. Nguyen. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (ln)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher W. Cardwell and Marshall Thomas McFarland admitted to this court. (ln)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alexandra Rose and Jeiel Noh: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/28/2021. (ln)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc. (ln)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond T. Do, M Vince Nail Spa, LLC, MT Vince Nail Spa, LLC, and Binh T. Nguyen (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3366802) filed by Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - United States Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Trademark Registration, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc. v. M Vince Nail Spa, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vince Nail Spa, Inc. doing business as M. Vince Nail Spa
Represented By: Jeiel Noh
Represented By: Alexandra Rose
Represented By: Christopher W. Cardwell
Represented By: Marshall Thomas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binh T. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Vince Nail Spa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond T. Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Vince Nail Spa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?