Mentouri v. Perdoceo Education Corporation
Plaintiff: Tarek Mentouri
Defendant: Perdoceo Education Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00383
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 On June 16, 2021, a telephone communication was received by Judge Campbell's chambers staff, claiming to be a family member of the pro se plaintiff, to inform the Court that Mr. Mentouri is currently incarcerated, and is not receiving the Court's mailings at the current address on the docket in this case. In light of this communication, chambers has directed the Clerks Office to update the Pro Se parties new address where he is being housed and to re-mail all the docket entries in this case to Mr. Tarek Mentouri by USPS. (All docket enters and current docket sheet was mailed to Mr. Tarek Mentouri, inmate ID #601116, Davidson County Correctional Development Center, 5113 Harding Place, Nashville, TN, 37211, and to, The Davidson County Sheriff's Office, PO Box 196383, Nashville, TN, 37219-6383 on 6/16/2021. Pro Se parties address updated on ECF.) (bs)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Mentouri is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by July 1, 2021, why the Magistrate Judge should not recommend that his claims be dismissed for failure to prosecute or for the reasons stated in the defendant's motion to dismiss. Mentouri must file his response in opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss at the same time he files his response to this Order to Show Cause. Mentouri is warned that failure to comply with this Order to Show Cause will likely result in a recommendation that his claims be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/11/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On May 19, 2021, Defendant Perdoceo Education Corporation filed a motion to dismiss pro se Plaintiff Tarek Mentouri's claims against it. (Doc. No. #5 .) Under this Court's Local Rule 7.01(a)(3), the plaintiff shall file any response in opposition to the motion to dismiss no later than fourteen days after they are served with the motion. The defendant may file an optional reply, limited to five pages, within seven days after service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/20/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss that asserts the recently-filed state Complaint is insufficient. (Doc. No. #5 ). This Motion is RESERVED for the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/19/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Perdoceo Education Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Morris, Samuel)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Perdoceo Education Corporation. (Morris, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 13, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
May 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel Aitken Morris admitted to this court. (ln)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Perdoceo Education Corporation. (ln)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Perdoceo Education Corporation from General Sessions Court of Davidson County, case number 21-GC-3597. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0650-3370859). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence Confirming TCPA Issue, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mentouri v. Perdoceo Education Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdoceo Education Corporation
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarek Mentouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?