Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: James Eugene Evans, III, Caren R. Evans and James Eugene Evans, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00403
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas Stephen Santel, Jr admitted to this court. (kc)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Continue by Caren R. Evans, James Eugene Evans, Jr. (Santel, Thomas)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Stephen Santel, Jr on behalf of Caren R. Evans, James Eugene Evans, Jr (Santel, Thomas)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to James Eugene Evans, III by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration with Confirmation of No Active Military Service)(McLemore, Jay)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ALIAS SUMMONS returned executed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Caren R. Evans served on 7/12/2021. (McLemore, Jay)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caren R. Evans. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Jay McLemore) by mail. (ln)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Caren R. Evans. (McLemore, Jay)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company as to Caren R. Evans. (McLemore, Jay)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. James Eugene Evans, Jr served on 6/8/2021. (McLemore, Jay)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. James Eugene Evans, III served on 6/7/2021. (McLemore, Jay)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: MOTION #9 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to July 26, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. A proposed case management order shall be filed three (3) days before the conference. Additionally, the proposed order shall also be emailed to chambers at frensleychambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov in Word format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/27/2021. (ln)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 7/26/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION Reschedule Initial CMC Due to Scheduling Conflict by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (McLemore, Jay)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (McLemore, Jay)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued as to Caren R. Evans, James Eugene Evans, Jr, and James Eugene Evans, III. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Jay McLemore) by mail. (ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/20/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Jay R. McLemore and Donald R. Ferguson admitted to this court. (ln)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT FORM USED.*** BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Insurance Company. (ln) Modified on 5/19/2021 (ln).
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caren R. Evans, James Eugene Evans, Jr, and James Eugene Evans, III (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3374869) filed by Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Homeowners Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Umbrella Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Renters Policy, #5 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eugene Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caren R. Evans
Represented By: Thomas Stephen Santel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eugene Evans, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Stephen Santel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Donald R. Ferguson
Represented By: Jay R. McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald R. Ferguson
Represented By: Jay R. McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?