Hernandezz v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tiffany Brooke Hernandezz
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2021cv00413
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 6/7/2021. (ln)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Office of Attorney General served on 06/08/2021. (ln)
June 8, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson admitted to this court. (ln)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Tiffany Brooke Hernandezz (Wilson, Robert)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/07/2021. (lh)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 06/01/2021. (ln)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies forwarded to the U.S. Marshals to effect service. (ln)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis. Docket No. #2 . The application is approved, and the Clerk is permitted to file the case and send the summonses and complaint to the Defendant, the U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Tennessee and to the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/28/2021. (ln)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, including the pending IFP application, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/27/2021. (ln)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3379585) by Tiffany Brooke Hernandezz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CGS WD PA, #2 Attachment CGS - PA Supreme Court, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Tiffany Brooke Hernandezz. (ln)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Tiffany Brooke Hernandezz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
May 25, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/15/2021. (ln)
May 25, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 6/15/2021. (ln)
May 25, 2021 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandezz v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Brooke Hernandezz
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Robert Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?