Jarrett et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jessica Jarrett and Joshua Jarrett
Defendant: United States of America
Amicus Curiae: Coin Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00419
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum #65 , the motion for oral argument (Doc. No. #52 ) and motion for leave to file an amicus brief (Doc. No. #49 ) are DENIED. The United States' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #41 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/30/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/30/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held a telephone conference with counsel for the parties on July 26, 2022. This matter has been stayed pending resolution of a motion to dismiss that raises a jurisdictional question. (Doc. No. #41 .) Counsel agree that the matter should remain stayed at this time, and the Court finds good cause for doing so. If the Court has not resolved the motion to dismiss by October 4, 2022, a telephonic case management conference is set at 9:30 a.m. on that date. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/26/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2022. (Hearing lasted 00:05)(sd)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: In light of the pending motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #41 ), which is jurisdictional in nature, the Court will SUSPEND all case management deadlines. A telephone conference is set on July 26, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/5/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2022. (Hearing lasted 00:07)(sd)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Forst, David)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Jessica Jarrett and Joshua Jarrett.(mg) Modified on 4/27/2022 (mg).
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiffs Joshua and Jessica Jarrett have filed a motion to modify the scheduling order deadline for motions to amend the pleadings and for leave to file an amended complaint. (Doc. No. #55 .) [T]he Jarretts' motion to modify the scheduling order and to amend the complaint (Doc. No. #55 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter the amended complaint (Doc. No. 55-1) as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/27/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 4/27/2022 (mg).
April 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Malone (Malone, Charles)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to re #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Forst, David)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. (McMonagle, Ryan)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to re #49 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by Coin Center. (Lyon, Devin)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Forst, David)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by United States of America. (McMonagle, Ryan)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (McMonagle, Ryan)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Devin Parker Lyon admitted to this court. (mg)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Hearing re #51 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Forst, David)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Joshua Jarrett, #2 Attachment Declaration of David L. Forst, #3 Exhibit Forst Ex. A (DOJ Letter), #4 Exhibit Forst Ex. B (Rejection Letter))(Forst, David)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coin Center. (Lyon, Devin)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Coin Center. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Exhibit Collective Exhibit 1 to Brief)(Lyon, Devin)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Devin Parker Lyon on behalf of Coin Center. (Lyon, Devin)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph F. Welborn, III, Charles Malone, Jason W. Callen, R. Gregory Parker admitted to this court. (mg)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Gregory Parker on behalf of Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett (Parker, R.)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Callen on behalf of Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett (Callen, Jason)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Malone on behalf of Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett (Malone, Charles)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Welborn, III on behalf of Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett (Welborn, Joseph)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #42 Memorandum in Support, #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Annotation - Deficiency Notice, (McMonagle, Ryan)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#41 , #42 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (mg)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America . (McMonagle, Ryan)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Ryan O. McMonagle, #2 Exhibit A (FedEx Proof of Delivery))(McMonagle, Ryan)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Based on the briefing schedule proposed by the parties (Doc. No. #39 ), the United States will file a motion to dismiss on February 28, 2022. (Doc. No. #39 .) Any response in opposition to the motion to dismiss will be filed by March 14, 2022. Any optional reply shall be filed by March 21, 2022. Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Campbell unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/23/2022. (mg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS REPORT (Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss) by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (McElroy, Sean)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held a telephonic case management conference with counsel for the parties on February 10, 2022. Counsel will file a proposed briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss by February 25, 2022. The fact and expert discovery deadlines set by the amended case management order are CONTINUED and will be addressed at a telephone conference set on May 5, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/10/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 2/10/2022. (Hearing lasted 00:12)(sd)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett of Letters (Norris, Cameron)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett of Withdrawal of Counsel Jacob A. Wittman (McElroy, Sean)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 3/7/2023 at 09:00 AM at the Fred D. Thompson U.S. Courthouse and Federal Building in Nashville, Tennessee before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2023; Exhibit List due by 2/20/2023; and Witness List due by 2/20/2023. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2021; Discovery due by 3/18/2022; and Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2022. A case management conference with the Magistrate Judge will be held by telephone on February 10, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 10/6/2021 (mg).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial is set for 8/22/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. The Joint Proposed Pretrial Order, Exhibit List, and Witness List are due by 8/7/2023. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/28/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2021; Discovery due by 3/18/2022; and Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2023. A case management conference with the Magistrate Judge will be held by telephone on February 10, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 9/21/2021. (Hearing lasted 00:26)(sd)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (McElroy, Sean)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Stephen Ho to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/10/2021. (lh)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NY State Bar status verified as active for Stephen S. Ho not admitted to this court - Local counsel not required. (mg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for attorney Stephen Ho to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ho, Stephen) Modified on 9/10/2021 (mg).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Ryan O. McMonagle to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/07/2021. (lh)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order CA State Bar status verified as active for Ryan O'Connor McMonagle admitted to this court. (mg)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #25 Answer to Complaint (McMonagle, Ryan)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for attorney Ryan O. McMonagle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ryan McMonagle - Certificate of Good Standing (Central District of California))(McMonagle, Ryan) Modified on 9/3/2021 (mg).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ryan O'Connor McMonagle: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/20/2021. (mg)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#25 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (mg)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(McMonagle, Ryan)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Plaintiffs Joshua Jarrett and Jessica Jarrett filed a motion to continue the initial case management conference set on August 13, 2021. #23 . The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to September 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (McElroy, Sean)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing per Order #24 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 9/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America, through Mary Jane Stewart, U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Tennessee on June 28, 2021 by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (McElroy, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: On July 21, 2021, Plaintiffs Joshua Jarrett and Jessica Jarrett filed a motion to continue the initial case management conference. (Doc. No. #15 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to August 13, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 8/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Norris, Cameron)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ****DISREGARD, SEE D/E#22 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mary Jane Stewart, U.S. Attorney, Middle District of Tennessee on 06/22/2021 by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (McElroy, Sean) Modified on 7/27/2021 (mg).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to United States of America through the IRS, and the U.S. Attorney. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Cameron Norris) by mail. (mg) Modified on 6/18/2021 (mg).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett of Additional Proposed Summonses (Attachments: #1 Attachment Additional Summons)(Norris, Cameron)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America on 06/04/2021 by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. All Plaintiffs. (McElroy, Sean)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 , #15 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Other Filings/Notice/Notice of Filing. Counsel shall re-file the documents. The documents can be attachments rather that multiple filings. (mg) Modified on 6/17/2021 (mg).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***DISREGARD*** Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint. (Norris, Cameron) Modified on 6/17/2021 (mg).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***DISREGARD*** Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint. (Norris, Cameron) Modified on 6/17/2021 (mg).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 , #11 , and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for David L. Forst, Sean P. McElroy, and Jacob A. Wittman to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 6/7/2021. (lh)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order WA State Bar status verified as active for Jacob A. Wittman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jacob A. Wittman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3382442) by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Norris, Cameron)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Sean P. McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3382441) by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Norris, Cameron)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for attorney David L. Forst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3382429) by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Norris, Cameron)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 and #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for J. Abraham Sutherland and Jeffrey M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 6/01/2021. (lh)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3382140) by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Norris, Cameron)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order VA State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey M. Harris not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/27/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for attorney J. Abraham Sutherland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3379916) by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Norris, Cameron)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CA State Bar status verified as active for J. Abraham Sutherland not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/28/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to United States of America. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Cameron Norris) by mail. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3379148), filed by Jessica Jarrett, Joshua Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CA State Bar status verified as active for David L. Forst, Sean P. McElroy not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeffrey M. Harris, David L. Forst, Sean P. McElroy, Jacob A. Wittman, J. Abraham Sutherland: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/16/2021. (mg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Cameron T. Norris admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrett et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Jarrett
Represented By: Sean P. McElroy
Represented By: J. Abraham Sutherland
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: David L. Forst
Represented By: Cameron Norris
Represented By: Jacob A. Wittman
Represented By: Charles Malone
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: R. Gregory Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jarrett
Represented By: Sean P. McElroy
Represented By: J. Abraham Sutherland
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: David L. Forst
Represented By: Cameron Norris
Represented By: Jacob A. Wittman
Represented By: Charles Malone
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Joseph F. Welborn, III
Represented By: R. Gregory Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan O'Connor McMonagle
Represented By: Stephen S. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coin Center
Represented By: Devin Parker Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?