George v. United States of America
Petitioner: George David George
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00463
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Petitioner's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 To Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (Doc. No. #1 , "Motion"). The Government shall respond to the Motion on or before September 6, 2021. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/5/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The motion #4 to substitute counsel is granted. Attorney Brent Adams Hannafan terminated. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/24/2021.(xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (ln)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by United States of America. (Booth, Kathryn)
June 23, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2255 and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by George David George. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - AO 243 Motion form)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Kathryn W. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George David George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?