BNA Associates, LLC v. Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.
Plaintiff: BNA Associates, LLC
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00481
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties shall notify the Court of the bankruptcy court's ruling within one day of its entry and, if the bankruptcy court has not ruled by September 15, 2021, shall file a joint status report on that date and every 28 days thereafter. The initial case management conference set on September 15, 2021, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Set/Reset Hearings (Initial Case Management Conference) by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.. (Callen, Jason)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Continue initial case management conference. ICMC is reset for 9/15/2021 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 2, 2021 Reset Hearing per Order #18 : Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 9/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by BNA Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Goldman's Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - BNA Associates' Objection to Goldman's Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Goldman's Reply)(Smith, Eric)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jane VanLare and Sean O'Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/15/2021. (lh)
July 12, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jane VanLare and Sean A. O'Neal not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P. answer due 9/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/9/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P. re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Complaint is Exhibit A to Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Exhibit A to Motion for Extension of Time)(Callen, Jason)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Complaint is Exhibit A to Notice of Removal) by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.. (Callen, Jason)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Sean O'Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3406676) by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Sean O'Neal, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sean O'Neal)(Callen, Jason)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Jane VanLare to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3406669) by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Jane VanLare, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jane VanLare)(Callen, Jason)
June 24, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul J. Krog admitted to this court. (kc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Krog on behalf of BNA Associates, LLC (Krog, Paul)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
June 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Eugene N. Bulso, Jr, Eric W. Smith, Jason W. Callen, and Charles Malone admitted to this court. (kc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P. (kc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Malone on behalf of Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P. (kc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Callen on behalf of Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P. (kc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P. from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 21-0403-IV. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 06503396287) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B James Declaration, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNA Associates, LLC v. Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNA Associates, LLC
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Smith
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Specialty Lending Group, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Malone
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Jane VanLare
Represented By: Sean A. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?