McFarland v. United States of America
Petitioner: Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr.
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00519
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to Motion to Vacate. (Notaristefano, Andrew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Substituting Attorney by United States of America. (Notaristefano, Andrew) Modified on 7/9/2021 (mg).
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Copy from criminal case 3:15-00072-5) ORDER as to Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr: We direct the Clerk of the Court to file Defendant's motion to vacate his sentence (Dkt. No. 577 ) as a new civil case and to extract Dkt. Nos. 577, 578, 579, and 580 from the above-captioned case and file in the new civil case. All subsequent filings related to the motion to vacate sentence shall be filed in the new civil case. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 7/8/2021. (dt)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Copy from criminal case 3:15-00072-5) ORDER as to Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr: The United States' response to Defendant's motion to vacate his sentence (Dkt. No. 577 ) is currently due by 7/7/2021. (Dkt. No. 578.) The United States has moved for a thirty-day extension, to 8/6/2021, to respond to Defendant's motion. (Dkt. No. 579.) Defendant does not object to the motion. We grant the United States' motion. The United States' response to Defendant's motion to vacate is due by 8/6/2021. Any reply is due by 8/27/2021. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 7/7/2021. (dt)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 (Copy from criminal case 3:15-00072-5) First MOTION for Thirty-Day Extension to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Vacate Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 by USA as to Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr. (Notaristefano, Andrew) (dt)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Copy from criminal case 3:15-00072-5) ORDER as to Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr: Any response to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Sentence (Dkt. No. 577 ) is due by July 7, 2021. Any reply is due by July 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 6/9/2021. (dt)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr. (Originally filed in error in criminal case 3:15-cr-00072 on 6/9/2021)(dt)
July 8, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Vakessha Hood-Schneider and Brent Adams Hannafan admitted to this court. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Anthony McFarland, Sr.
Represented By: Vakessha Hood-Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Andrew Notaristefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?