Bush et al v. Reliant Bank et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Byron V. Bush and Kelly Diane Bush
Defendant: Reliant Bank, DeVan D. Ard, Jr., Rick Belote, Judge James G. Martin, III, Frank G. Clement, Steven J. Stafford, Reliant Bancorp, Inc. and William Ronald DeBerry
Case Number: 3:2021cv00525
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed as to Reliant Bank served on 8/16/2021. (vh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS returned executed as to Rick Belote served on 8/16/2021. (vh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed as Frank G. Clement served on 8/12/2021. (vh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed as to Reliant Bancorp, Inc. served on 8/12/2021. (vh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed as to Steven J. Stafford served on 8/12/2021. (vh)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: On July 15, 2021, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to show cause why the Court had subject-matter jurisdiction to hear this case. (Doc. No. #9 .) The Court directed Plaintiffs to submit an amended complaint that "describe[d] what federal law or part of the U.S. Constitution gives rise to their claim." Plaintiffs submitted an Amended Complaint that fails to comply with the Court's Order. (Doc. No. #16 .) Because pro se Plaintiffs made an attempt to comply with the Court's Order, however, the Court will allow one final opportunity to address these concerns. To do so, Plaintiffs MUST submit a second amended complaint within 30 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket. The Clerk SHALL mail Plaintiffs a blank form Complaint for a Civil Case (Pro Se 1). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/20/2021. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail along with two blank Complaints for a Civil case.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 10, 2021 Summons issued as to William Ronald DeBerry per DE #17 . (vh)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 Summons issued as to DeVan D. Ard, Jr, Rick Belote, Frank G. Clement, James G. Martin, III, Reliant Bancorp, Inc., Reliant Bank, Steven J. Stafford, and William Ronald DeBerry. (vh). Modified on 8/11/2021 (vh).
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT For INDEPENDENT ACTION "arising under" FEDERAL QUESTION JURISDICTION against DeVan D. Ard, Jr, Rick Belote, Frank G. Clement, James G. Martin, III, Reliant Bank, Steven J. Stafford, Reliant Bancorp, Inc., and William Ronald DeBerry, filed by Kelly Diane Bush and Byron V. Bush.(vh) Modified on 8/11/2021 (vh).
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed as to Rick Belote served on 7/16/2021. (vh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed as to Steven J. Stafford served on 7/21/2021. (vh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed as to Frank G. Clement served on 7/16/2021. (vh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to DeVan D. Ard, Jr. (vh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to James G. Martin, III. (vh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed as to Reliant Bank served on 7/13/2021. (vh)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiffs Dr. Byron V. Bush and Kelly Diane Bush filed a pro se Complaint for fraud against Reliant Bank, several Reliant employees, and three Tennessee judges. (Doc. No. #1 .) It is not clearly apparent that the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction to hear this case. Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction in this case by submitting an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs MUST submit the Amended Complaint, or request an extension of time, within 30 DAYS of the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiffs are warned that failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice. The Clerk SHALL mail Plaintiffs a blank form Complaint for a Civil Case (Pro Se 1). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/15/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/blank complaint form. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reliant Bank. (Montgomery, Stephen)
July 14, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (vh)
July 14, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen M. Montgomery admitted to this court. (vh)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reliant Bank. (Montgomery, Stephen)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Montgomery on behalf of DeVan D. Ard, Jr, Rick Belote, Reliant Bank (Montgomery, Stephen)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to DeVan D. Ard, Jr, Rick Belote, Frank G. Clement, James G. Martin, III, Reliant Bank, and Steven J. Stafford. (jm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh)
July 12, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DeVan D. Ard, Jr, Rick Belote, Frank G. Clement, James G. Martin, III, Reliant Bank, and Steven J. Stafford (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675062959), filed by Kelly Diane Bush and Byron V. Bush. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush et al v. Reliant Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Byron V. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Diane Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Bank
Represented By: Stephen M. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVan D. Ard, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Belote
Represented By: Stephen M. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge James G. Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank G. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ronald DeBerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?