Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Amanda Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2021cv00530
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/15/2021. (lh)
July 15, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis admitted to this court. (kc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Kaludis on behalf of Amanda Harris (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Kaludis, William)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/13/2021. (ln)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3408855) by Amanda Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
July 13, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc)
July 13, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/3/2021. (kc)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503408043), filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Harris
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?