Chiusa v. Stubenrauch et al
Plaintiff: Donald A. Chiusa, Jr.
Defendant: Fred Stubenrauch, Copper Ventures, LLC and Basic Copper, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00545
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting defendant Basic Cooper Inc.'s #22 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/14/2021. (vh)
September 13, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Copper Ventures, LLC, Fred Stubenrauch . (Sanders, Richard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Copper Ventures, LLC, Fred Stubenrauch. (Sanders, Richard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT filed by Basic Copper, Inc. re #24 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Gal, Raanon)
September 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Basic Copper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Attachment Declaration of Arthur Kunz)(Gal, Raanon)
September 13, 2021 Filing 23 Sealed Document related to Motion for Leave to file Under Seal filed by Basic Copper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of A. Kunz)(Gal, Raanon)
September 13, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Basic Copper, Inc.. (Gal, Raanon)
September 13, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Basic Copper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Gal, Raanon)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Basic Copper, Inc. answer due 9/13/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2021. (vh)
September 3, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Basic Copper, Inc.. (Gal, Raanon)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BASIC COPPER INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Basic Copper, Inc. answer due 9/3/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/23/2021. (vh)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Copper Ventures, LLC answer due 9/13/2021; Fred Stubenrauch answer due 9/13/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/23/2021. (vh)
August 23, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Raanon Gal and Richard G. Sanders, Jr admitted to this court. (vh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA,,, #1 Complaint, by Copper Ventures, LLC, Fred Stubenrauch. (Sanders, Richard)
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BASIC COPPER INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Basic Copper, Inc.. (Gal, Raanon)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Raanon Gal on behalf of Basic Copper, Inc. (Gal, Raanon)
August 19, 2021 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Copper Ventures, LLC. (Sanders, Richard)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G. Sanders, Jr on behalf of Copper Ventures, LLC, Fred Stubenrauch (Sanders, Richard)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr. Copper Ventures, LLC served on 8/11/2021., SUMMONS returned executed by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr. Copper Ventures, LLC served on 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Shrum, Barry)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr. Basic Copper, Inc. served on 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Process Server)(Shrum, Barry)
August 3, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Return of Service. Counsel shall re-file the document. (vh)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr on agent for Basic Copper, Inc. (Shrum, Barry)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr. (Shrum, Barry)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr. (Shrum, Barry)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (vh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Basic Copper, Inc., Copper Ventures, LLC, and Fred Stubenrauch. (service copies to be picked up by counsel.) (vh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Basic Copper, Inc., Copper Ventures, LLC, and Fred Stubenrauch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3413111), filed by Donald A. Chiusa, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CC TM Reg, #2 Exhibit B - Copyright Reg 1, #3 Exhibit C - Copyright Reg 2, #4 Exhibit D - Copyright Reg 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
July 20, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cheshire Rigler admitted to this court. (vh) Modified on 8/3/2021 (vh).
July 20, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Cheshire Rigler: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 8/10/2021. (vh)
July 20, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Barry Neil Shrum admitted to this court. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiusa v. Stubenrauch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Chiusa, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Neil Shrum
Represented By: Chesire Rigler
Represented By: Cheshire Rigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Stubenrauch
Represented By: Richard G. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Richard G. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Copper, Inc.
Represented By: Raanon Gal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?