Nwofia v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: IKECHUKWU NWOFIA
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud and DESHAWNA WILLIAMS
Case Number: 3:2021cv00570
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 23 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #22 Order. (ln)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No. #21 , "Stipulation") pursuant to Fed. Rs. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, the Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. As indicated in the Stipulation, "each [p]arty shall be responsible for their own costs and fees." Doc. No. #21 at 1. This Order shall constitute final judgment for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/27/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, DESHAWNA WILLIAMS. (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
August 4, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon admitted to this court. (kc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of All Defendants (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/28/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 9/29/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from the District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-01311. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 Correspondence to USDC for the Middle District of Tennessee re: Transfer of Case. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant's #11 Motion to Transfer Case to the USDC for the Middle District of Tennessee and to extend time to answer/respond to complaint on or before the amount of days set forth after this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Ikechukwu Nwofia re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case and for Extension of Time Plaintiff's constent to transfer (Hacking, James) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case and for Extension of Time by Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Deshawna Williams (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/22/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ikechukwu Nwofia. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Deshawna Williams or counsel for Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Deshawna Williams are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/1/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)[Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Deshawna Williams (LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 5/28/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Ikechukwu Nwofia or counsel for Ikechukwu Nwofia are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/11/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Deshawna Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9298741.), filed by Ikechukwu Nwofia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/28/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nwofia v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IKECHUKWU NWOFIA
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESHAWNA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?