Isaac v. Broadcast Music, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monte Isaac
Defendant: Broadcast Music, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, William Haynes, Cindy Haynes, Sunshade Music and Elizabeth Haynes
Case Number: 3:2021cv00579
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: An initial case management conference is scheduled in this case for Tuesday, October 5, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. Due to unforeseen circumstances, Magistrate Judge Holmes will not be able to conduct the initial case management conference. Magistrate Judge Holmes will, instead, enter the proposed initial case management order (the "ICMO"), with modifications to conform to the Court's preferred case management schedule. To monitor the progression of this case, Magistrate Judge Holmes will hold a subsequent status/case management conference as provided for in the ICMO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Monte Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment of royalties, #2 Exhibit Exclusive songwriting contract, #3 Exhibit BMI Letter of Direction, #4 Exhibit June 2012 Notice of Termination, #5 Exhibit May 2015 Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit June 2015 Notice of Termination, #7 Exhibit Order appointing personal representative, #8 Exhibit June 2020 letter to BMI, #9 Exhibit January 2021 email to BMI, #10 Exhibit January 2021 letter to BMI, #11 Exhibit January 2021 letter to Round Hil, #12 Exhibit March 2021 letter to Round Hill, #13 Exhibit Certified mail receipts)(Hugan, Christopher)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monte Isaac. William Haynes waiver sent on 8/12/2021. (Hugan, Christopher)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monte Isaac. Cindy Haynes waiver sent on 8/12/2021. (Hugan, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock, Keane A. Barger admitted to this court. (mg)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Keane A. Barger on behalf of Cindy Haynes, William Haynes (Barger, Keane)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Warnock on behalf of Cindy Haynes, William Haynes (Warnock, Timothy)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Monte Isaac. Broadcast Music, Inc. served on 8/17/2021. (Hugan, Christopher)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/10/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Campbell or the assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/6/2021. (ln)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Monte Isaac of counsel's current address (Hugan, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Monte Isaac Business Entity Disclosure (Hugan, Christopher)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Broadcast Music, Inc., Cindy Haynes, William Haynes, Round Hill Music LP, Sunshade Music. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broadcast Music, Inc., Cindy Haynes, William Haynes, Round Hill Music LP, Sunshade Music (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3418275), filed by Monte Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assignment of Royalties, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exclusive Songwriting Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 - BMI Letter of Direction, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 2012 Notice of Termination, #5 Exhibit 5 - May 2015 Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 2015 Notice of Termination, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order appointing personal representative, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 2020 letter to BMI, #9 Exhibit 9 - January 2021 email to BMI, #10 Exhibit 10 - January 2021 letter to BMI, #11 Exhibit 11 - January 2021 letter to Round Hill, #12 Exhibit 12 - March 2021 letter to Round Hill, #13 Exhibit 13 - Certified Mail Receipts, #14 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Attachment 14 replaced on 7/28/2021) (mg).
July 28, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher E. Hugan admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Broadcast Music, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Isaac
Represented By: Christopher E. Hugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round Hill Music LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Haynes
Represented By: Keane A. Barger
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Haynes
Represented By: Keane A. Barger
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshade Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?