Finnegan v. Dillon Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dana Finnegan
Defendant: Dillon Transportation, LLC, Donald Dillon and Angela Dillon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00604
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Angela Dillon, Donald Dillon, Dillon Transportation, LLC.(Northen, Gregory)
September 30, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt)
September 29, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed by Dana Finnegan. Angela Dillon served on 9/29/2021. (Sands, Eric)
September 29, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed by Dana Finnegan. Donald Dillon served on 9/29/2021. (Sands, Eric)
September 29, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dillon Transportation, LLC.(Seaton, Henry)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: An initial case management conference is scheduled in this case for Tuesday, October 12, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. The parties are required to prepare and file a proposed joint initial case management order in advance of the initial case management conference (and to send a copy in Word format to the Courtroom Deputy) as previously instructed. Due to unforeseen circumstances, Magistrate Judge Holmes will not be able to conduct the initial case management conference. Magistrate Judge Holmes will, instead, enter the proposed initial case management order (the "ICMO"), with modifications to conform to the Court's preferred case management schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/24/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Gregory J. Northen to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/22/2021.(lh)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for attorney Gregory J. Northen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (corrected Certificate of Good Standing) (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Dillon Transportation, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (dt)
September 20, 2021 AR State Bar status verified as active for Gregory J. Northen not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dillon Transportation, LLC answer due 9/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Gregory J. Northen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3449474) by Dillon Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Seaton, Henry) Modified on 9/22/2021 (lh).
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dillon Transportation, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 and #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Nicholas Conlon and Eric Sands to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/01/2021. (lh)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Eric Sands from the United States District Court for the District of Colorado filed by Dana Finnegan. (Conlon, Nicholas)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Nicholas Conlon from the United States District Court for the District of Colorado filed by Dana Finnegan. (Conlon, Nicholas)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 - #9 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificates shall be filed within 10 days. (dt)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Eric Sands to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3434727) by Dana Finnegan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Eric Sands)(Conlon, Nicholas)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Nicholas Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3434706) by Dana Finnegan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Nicholas Conlon)(Conlon, Nicholas)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/12/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Angela Dillon, Donald Dillon and Dillon Transportation, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
August 5, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Justin G. Day admitted to this court. (dt)
August 5, 2021 NJ State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas Conlon not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
August 5, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas Conlon and Eric Sands: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/26/2021. (dt)
August 5, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Eric Sands not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angela Dillon, Donald Dillon and Dillon Transportation, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3422575), filed by Dana Finnegan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finnegan v. Dillon Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Finnegan
Represented By: Eric Sands
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Represented By: Nicholas Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Gregory J. Northen
Represented By: Henry E. Seaton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Dillon
Represented By: Gregory J. Northen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Dillon
Represented By: Gregory J. Northen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?