Keator v. McCormick Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Keator
Defendant: McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc., Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick and Tracie McCormick
Case Number: 3:2021cv00605
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for October 5, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby reset to December 6, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/1/2021. (mg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing by Carrie Keator (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form (Christian))(Masker, Curt)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Motion to Consolidate Cases (DE# 9, 3:21-cv-0650) is Granted. This case shall be consolidated into the Keator case, with Keator being the main case (3:21-cv-00605) and all further filings to be under that case number. Upon consultation with Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley, who will be the assigned magistrate judge in the consolidated case, the initial case management conference scheduled for October 5, 2021, is CANCELLED to be reset in the consolidated case by order of Judge Frensley. The Clerk is directed to also enter this order in Keator v. McCormick Trucking, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:21-cv-00605. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/30/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JOINT) filed by Carrie Keator. (Masker, Curt)
September 27, 2021 Filing 22 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Action Trailer Services, Inc.. (Bissinger, Fredrick)
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by McCormick Trucking, Inc.. (Bissinger, Fredrick)
September 27, 2021 Filing 20 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tracie McCormick, Inc.. (Bissinger, Fredrick)
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc..(Bissinger, Fredrick)
September 27, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel E. Arciniegas admitted to this court. (vh)
September 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Arciniegas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Arciniegas, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Joint MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule. Response due by 10/5/2021 to #13 MOTION to Certify Class. Replies due by 10/19/2021. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/17/2021. (vh)
September 16, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule re #13 MOTION to Certify Class by Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc.. (Bissinger, Fredrick)
September 10, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward H. Trent admitted to this court. (vh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward H. Trent on behalf of All Defendants (Trent, Edward)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc. answer due 9/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/8/2021. (vh)
September 8, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Fredrick J. Bissinger and Jerome D. Pinn admitted to this court. (vh)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Certify Class by Carrie Keator. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Text Message, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Reminder Email and Postcard, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Carrie Keator, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jerod Rickard, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Justin Graham, #8 Exhibit G - Earnings Statements of Carrie Keator, #9 Exhibit H - Earnings Statements of Jerod Rickard, #10 Exhibit I - Earnings Statements of Justin Graham)(Masker, Curt)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc.. (Bissinger, Fredrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome D. Pinn on behalf of Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc. (Pinn, Jerome)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick J. Bissinger on behalf of Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., Tracie McCormick, Inc. (Bissinger, Fredrick)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Carrie Keator (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - J. Rickard Consent Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - J. Graham Consent Form)(Masker, Curt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Carrie Keator. All Defendants. (Masker, Curt)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/5/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., and Tracie McCormick, Inc. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Trailer Services, Inc., Robert McCormick, Tracie McCormick, McCormick Trucking, Inc., and Tracie McCormick, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3422633), filed by Carrie Keator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
August 4, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Curt M. Masker admitted to this court. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keator v. McCormick Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Keator
Represented By: Curt M. Masker
Represented By: Daniel E. Arciniegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Trent
Represented By: Fredrick J. Bissinger
Represented By: Jerome D. Pinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie McCormick, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Trent
Represented By: Fredrick J. Bissinger
Represented By: Jerome D. Pinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Trailer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Trent
Represented By: Fredrick J. Bissinger
Represented By: Jerome D. Pinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McCormick
Represented By: Edward H. Trent
Represented By: Fredrick J. Bissinger
Represented By: Jerome D. Pinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie McCormick
Represented By: Edward H. Trent
Represented By: Fredrick J. Bissinger
Represented By: Jerome D. Pinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?