Hardy v. Mays
Petitioner: RonAllen Hardy
Respondent: Tony Mays
Case Number: 3:2021cv00627
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Ron Allen Hardy, an inmate of the Riverbend Maximum Security Institution in Nashville, Tennessee, filed a pro se petition for writ of habeas corpus and submitted the full filing fee. (Doc. No. #1 ). After conducting a preliminary review of Petitioner's Section 2254 petition and supporting documents under Rule 4, Rules--Section 2254 Cases, it is not readily apparent that Petitioner is not entitled to relief. Consequently, Respondent is ORDERED to file an answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the petition in conformance with Rule 5, Rules-- 2254 Cases, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/4/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a copy of this Order and petition to Respondent and the Attorney General of Tennessee.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 10/4/2021 (mg).
August 20, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Matthew Stahl admitted to this court. (ln)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Matthew Stahl on behalf of Tony Mays (Stahl, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT #34675063272 in the amount of $5.00 posted by RonAllen Hardy re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ln)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
August 12, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION (fee paid) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RonAllen Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibits to Petition, #2 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RonAllen Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony Mays
Represented By: Michael Matthew Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?